EP2718917 - SMOKE ALARM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ista International GmbH Grugaplatz 2 45131 Essen / DE | For all designated states Job Lizenz GmbH & Co. KG Kurt-Fischer-Strasse 30 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖPKE, Gerhard Islandstrasse 37 23570 Travemünde / DE | 02 /
NIEDERFELD, Gerhard Wusthoffstrasse 6 45131 Essen / DE | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wißgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2014/16] | Application number, filing date | 12718918.1 | 27.04.2012 | [2015/40] | WO2012EP01856 | Priority number, date | DE201110105183 | 09.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011105183 | [2014/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012167858 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2718917 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2718917 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/107, G08B29/18 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
G08B17/107 (EP);
G08B29/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUCHWARNMELDER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB | [2014/16] | English: | SMOKE ALARM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME | [2014/16] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE FUMÉES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 06.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2012 | AL | 30.09.2015 | BG | 30.09.2015 | CY | 30.09.2015 | CZ | 30.09.2015 | DK | 30.09.2015 | EE | 30.09.2015 | ES | 30.09.2015 | FI | 30.09.2015 | HR | 30.09.2015 | IT | 30.09.2015 | LT | 30.09.2015 | LV | 30.09.2015 | MC | 30.09.2015 | MK | 30.09.2015 | MT | 30.09.2015 | PL | 30.09.2015 | RO | 30.09.2015 | RS | 30.09.2015 | SE | 30.09.2015 | SI | 30.09.2015 | SK | 30.09.2015 | SM | 30.09.2015 | TR | 30.09.2015 | NO | 30.12.2015 | GR | 31.12.2015 | IS | 30.01.2016 | PT | 01.02.2016 | IE | 27.04.2016 | LU | 27.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 27.04.2012 | |
BG | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.04.2012 | |
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 27.04.2012 | |
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.04.2012 | |
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 27.04.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 30.09.2015 | |
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 30.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1191496 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0014] - [0018] - [0026] , [0027] *; | [A]DE19947023 (SIEMENS GEBAEUDESICHERHEIT GMB [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * * column 2, line 31 - column 2, line 47 * * column 3, line 27 - column 33 * * column 3, line 39 - column 3, line 40 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 14 * * column 5, line 3 - column 5, line 38 *; | [A]EP1688898 (HOCHIKI CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0031] - [0045] - [0052] - [0055] - [0100] * * paragraphs [0166] - [0179] - [0187]; figures 5,6,7 * | by applicant | EP1191496 |