EP2699755 - HYBRID RISER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magma Global Limited Magma House Trafalgar Wharf Hamilton Road Portsmouth, Hampshire PO6 4PX / GB | [2017/43] |
Former [2017/24] | For all designated states Magma Global Limited Ground Floor Building 1000 Lakeside North Harbour Western Road, Portsmouth PO6 3EZ / GB | ||
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Magma Global Limited Ground Floor Building 1000 Lakeside North Harbour Western Road, Portsmouth PO6 3EZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATTON, Stephen Waverley Send Marsh Road Woking Surrey GU23 6JB / GB | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | K2 IP Limited c/o Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Wilding, Richard Alan, et al K2 IP Limited No. 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | ||
Former [2014/09] | Docherty, Andrew John Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12719423.1 | 18.04.2012 | [2017/24] | WO2012GB00354 | Priority number, date | GB20110006473 | 18.04.2011 Original published format: GB 201106473 | US201113158100 | 10.06.2011 Original published format: US201113158100 | GB20110012469 | 20.07.2011 Original published format: GB 201112469 | GB20110016226 | 20.09.2011 Original published format: GB 201116226 | [2014/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012143672 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2699755 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2699755 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/10, E21B17/01 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
E21B17/012 (EP);
E21B17/1035 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/09] | E21B17/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDSTEIGLEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2014/09] | English: | HYBRID RISER SYSTEM | [2014/09] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COLONNE MONTANTE HYBRIDE | [2014/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 06.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2012 | AL | 14.06.2017 | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | ES | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | IT | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | MK | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | RS | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | SM | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 18.04.2012 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 18.04.2012 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9957413 (KVAERNER OILFIELD PROD AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-38 * page 3, lines 1-15 * * page 4, lines 6-15; figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]WO02072995 (CSO AKER MARINE CONTRACTORS IN [US]) [Y] 1-38 * page 4, lines 10-14 * * page 14, lines 19-23; figures 1-9 *; | [Y]FR2852677 (SAIPEM SA [FR]) [Y] 1-38 * page 21, line 8 - page 22, line 24; figures 1-11 *; | [Y]US5657823 (KOGURE EIJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-38 * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 39; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US4462717 (FALCIMAIGNE JEAN [FR]) [Y] 1-38 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 56; figures 1-5 * | Examination | US2011073315 | by applicant | US6082391 |