|
16.03.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Communication regarding the forthcoming grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
05.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.08.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.05.2012 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.05.2012 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
01.05.2012 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
01.05.2012 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
01.05.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |