17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
16.03.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
07.04.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
04.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2017 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
13.03.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.03.2017 |
Deletion: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.03.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
07.03.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
07.03.2017 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.03.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.12.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.01.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.11.2014 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.06.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.06.2014 |
First examination report |
|
30.05.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.01.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
27.12.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] |
27.12.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] |
01.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|