EP2689108 - COMPRESSOR AIRFOIL WITH TIP DIHEDRAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2014/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREEZE-STRINGFELLOW, Andrew 6380 Aviaton Way West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 02 /
CLARK, David, Scott 6380 Aviation Way West Chester, OH 45069 / US | 03 /
BEACHER, Brent, Franklin 6380 Aviation Way West Chester, OH 45069 / US | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2017/19] |
Former [2014/10] | Williams, Andrew Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2014/05] | Williams, Andrew Richard GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12720017.8 | 16.03.2012 | [2017/19] | WO2012US29365 | Priority number, date | US201113071996 | 25.03.2011 Original published format: US201113071996 | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012134835 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2689108 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2689108 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F04D29/32 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
F04D29/324 (EP,US);
F01D5/141 (EP,US);
F05D2240/121 (EP,US);
F05D2240/122 (EP,US);
F05D2240/303 (EP,US);
F05D2240/304 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDICHTERSCHAUFEL MIT SPITZEN-V-FORM | [2014/05] | English: | COMPRESSOR AIRFOIL WITH TIP DIHEDRAL | [2014/05] | French: | AUBE DE COMPRESSEUR DOTÉE D'UN DIÈDRE DE POINTE | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.03.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2012 | AL | 10.05.2017 | AT | 10.05.2017 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | IT | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | NL | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | RS | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | SM | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.03.2012 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 16.03.2012 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1074700 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,7,9-11,13,16,19 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0009] , [0015] , [0016] * * figures 9,10 * [I] 8,17; | [A]EP1505302 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-3,5-20 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0026] - [0034] * * figures 2,5,6 *; | [A]EP1930598 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-3,5-20 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0032] , [0033] ** figures 4,9,12 *; | [XI]US2010054946 (OROSA JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0006] , [0026] , [0027] , [0030] , [0039] , [0042] - [0048] - [0051] , [0052] * * figures 2,8-10,12,13 * [I] 7-20; | [XI]EP2199543 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0016] , [0017] * * figures 3,5,6 * [I] 7-20; | [XI] - MINGMING M ET AL, "Numerical Investigation of the Unsteady Flow in a Transonic Compressor with Curved Rotors", CHINESE JOURNAL OF AERONAUTICS,, vol. 21, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S1000-9361(08)60013-8, ISSN 1000-9361, (20080401), pages 97 - 104, (20080401), XP022937497 [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document * * page 98, left column, last paragraph - right column, first paragraph * * page 103, left column, lines 13-19 * * figures 1,8 * [I] 3,7-9,12-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1000-9361(08)60013-8 | by applicant | US5167489 |