|
22.01.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.06.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.05.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
21 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |