Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9470576 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2016 | B2 | US2014013848 | 16.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012FR50682 | 29.03.2012 | FR1152774 | 31.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6037401B | Global Dossier | 07.12.2016 | B2 | JP2014510921 | 01.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012FR50682 | 29.03.2012 | FR1152774 | 31.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103547889B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2017 | B | CN103547889 | 29.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012FR50682 | 29.03.2012 | FR1152774 | 31.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2831532 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2018 | C | CA2831532 | 20.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012FR50682 | 29.03.2012 | FR1152774 | 31.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2691742 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2020 | B1 | EP2691742 | 05.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012FR50682 | 29.03.2012 | FR1152774 | 31.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012172204 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1152774 | 31.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2973504 | 10.01.2014 | B1 | FR2973504 | 05.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1152774 | 31.03.2011 |