EP2697611 - SYSTEM FOR MEASURING THE LOAD ON A BRIDGE WHEN BEING USED BY A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petschacher, Markus Am Hügel 4 9560 Feldkirchen / AT | [2014/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/02] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2014/08] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 12720774.4 | 10.04.2012 | [2016/02] | WO2012AT00098 | Priority number, date | AT20110000513 | 11.04.2011 Original published format: AT 5132011 | [2014/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012139145 | Date: | 18.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2697611 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2697611 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/02, G01M5/00 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
G01G19/024 (EP,US);
G01N3/00 (US);
G01M5/0008 (EP,US);
G01M5/0041 (EP,US);
G01M5/0066 (EP,US);
G01M5/0083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Extension states | BA | 22.10.2013 | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM MESSEN DER BELASTUNG EINER BRÜCKE BEIM BEFAHREN DURCH EIN FAHRZEUG | [2014/08] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MEASURING THE LOAD ON A BRIDGE WHEN BEING USED BY A VEHICLE | [2014/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MESURE DE LA CHARGE D'UN PONT LORS DU PASSAGE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2014/08] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 16.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.01.2016 | CY | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MK | 13.01.2016 | MT | 13.01.2016 | NL | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | RS | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | SM | 13.01.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | CY | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | HR | 13.01.2016 | |
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | HR | 13.01.2016 | |
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | HR | 13.01.2016 | |
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | HR | 13.01.2016 | |
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 13.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4901575 (BOHANNAN WILLIAM L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,10 * abstract * * figures 1,4,5,6,8,13 * * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 47 * * column 9, line 11 - column 16, line 42 * * column 19, line 1 - column 22, line 59 * [I] 13; | [XI]US5111897 (SNYDER RICHARD E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10,16,17 * abstract * * figures 1-4,7 * * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 19 * * column 4, line 9 - column 9, line 65 * [I] 13; | [XI]US2005204825 (KUNERTH DENNIS C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,15 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * column 6 - column 8 * * column 18 - column 51 * [I] 4,14; | [X]US2007062289 (HEYMAN JOSEPH S [US], et al) [X] 1,5,13 * abstract * * figures 1,6,9-11 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * column 23 - column 31 ** column 46 - column 48 *; | [XY]WO2009063523 (BASTIANINI FILIPPO [IT]) [X] 1,2,5,7-10,16,17 * abstract * * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 58 * * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 40 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 12; | [X]EP2192377 (BAM BUNDESANSTALT MATFORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,11,15-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [XY] - OU, LI, YU, "Development and performance of wireless sensor network for structural health monitoring", PROC. OF SPIE. SMART STRUCTURES AND MATERIALS, (20040729), vol. 5391, pages 765 - 773, XP040183626 [X] 1,5,8,10,11,15 * the whole document * [Y] 12 | by applicant | - KLEINE ZEITUNG, (200904), vol. 15, page 35 |