EP2706982 - INTRANASAL PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORMS COMPRISING NALOXONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. 1, rue Jean Piret 2350 Luxembourg / LU | [2016/26] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Euro-Celtique S.A. 2, avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRANG, John c/o National Addiction Centre Addiction Sciences Building 4 Windsor Walk Denmark Hill London SE5 8AF / GB | 02 /
OKSCHE, Alexander c/o Mundipharma GmbH Mundipharma Straße 2 65549 Limburg / DE | 03 /
HARRIS, Stephen c/o Purdue Pharma L. P. One Stamford Forum 201 Tresser Boulevard Stamford Connecticut 06901-3431 / US | 04 /
SMITH, Kevin c/o Mundipharma Research Limited Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0GW / GB | 05 /
MOTTIER, Lucie Helene Jeanne c/o Mundipharma Research Limited Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0GW / GB | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Ledl, Andreas Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/10] | Ledl, Andreas Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/12] | Ledl, Andreas Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12721507.7 | 11.05.2012 | [2018/01] | WO2012EP58792 | Priority number, date | EP20110166076 | 13.05.2011 Original published format: EP 11166076 | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012156317 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2706982 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2706982 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2706982 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K31/135, A61K9/08, A61P25/36 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/485 (EP,AT,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K9/0043 (AT,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K47/02 (IL,RU,US);
A61K9/0019 (IL,US);
A61K9/08 (AT,IL,RU);
A61K9/12 (CN,IL);
A61P11/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/04 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | 12.12.2013 | ME | 12.12.2013 | Title | German: | INTRANASALE PHARMAZEUTISCHE DARREICHUNGSFORMEN MIT NALOXON | [2014/12] | English: | INTRANASAL PHARMACEUTICAL DOSAGE FORMS COMPRISING NALOXONE | [2014/12] | French: | FORMES DOSIFIÉES PHARMACEUTIQUES INTRANASALES COMPRENANT DE LA NALOXONE | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 01.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2015 | Observations by third parties | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2017 | Observations by third parties | 27.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.07.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17208976.5 / EP3320893 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.10.2018
20.11.2019
WITHDRAWN Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Booth, Catherine Louise Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/10] |
Former [2019/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.10.2018
20.11.2019
WITHDRAWN Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Booth, Catherine Louise Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2018/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.10.2018
WITHDRAWN Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB Opponent's representative Booth, Catherine Louise Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | 10.10.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.02.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.06.2020 | 09.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.07.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.02.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.05.2020 | CY | 11.05.2020 | HR | 11.05.2020 | LT | 11.05.2020 | LU | 11.05.2020 | LV | 11.05.2020 | MT | 11.05.2020 | RO | 11.05.2020 | RS | 11.05.2020 | SK | 11.05.2020 | TR | 11.05.2020 | HU | 12.05.2020 | SI | 12.05.2020 | MC | 02.06.2020 | BG | 30.11.2020 | SM | 03.12.2020 | [2023/50] |
Former [2022/30] | CY | 11.05.2020 | |
HR | 11.05.2020 | ||
LT | 11.05.2020 | ||
LU | 11.05.2020 | ||
LV | 11.05.2020 | ||
MT | 11.05.2020 | ||
RO | 11.05.2020 | ||
RS | 11.05.2020 | ||
SK | 11.05.2020 | ||
TR | 11.05.2020 | ||
HU | 12.05.2020 | ||
SI | 12.05.2020 | ||
MC | 02.06.2020 | ||
BG | 30.11.2020 | ||
SM | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CY | 11.05.2020 | |
HR | 11.05.2020 | ||
LT | 11.05.2020 | ||
LU | 11.05.2020 | ||
LV | 11.05.2020 | ||
RO | 11.05.2020 | ||
RS | 11.05.2020 | ||
SK | 11.05.2020 | ||
HU | 12.05.2020 | ||
SI | 12.05.2020 | ||
MC | 02.06.2020 | ||
BG | 30.11.2020 | ||
SM | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | CY | 11.05.2020 | |
HR | 11.05.2020 | ||
LT | 11.05.2020 | ||
LU | 11.05.2020 | ||
LV | 11.05.2020 | ||
RO | 11.05.2020 | ||
RS | 11.05.2020 | ||
SK | 11.05.2020 | ||
HU | 12.05.2020 | ||
MC | 02.06.2020 | ||
BG | 30.11.2020 | ||
SM | 03.12.2020 | ||
GR | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CY | 11.05.2020 | |
HR | 11.05.2020 | ||
LT | 11.05.2020 | ||
LV | 11.05.2020 | ||
RO | 11.05.2020 | ||
RS | 11.05.2020 | ||
SK | 11.05.2020 | ||
HU | 12.05.2020 | ||
MC | 02.06.2020 | ||
BG | 30.11.2020 | ||
SM | 03.12.2020 | ||
GR | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CY | 11.05.2020 | |
LT | 11.05.2020 | ||
RO | 11.05.2020 | ||
HU | 12.05.2020 | ||
MC | 02.06.2020 | ||
BG | 30.11.2020 | ||
SM | 03.12.2020 | ||
GR | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 11.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO8203768 (UNIV KENTUCKY [US]); | [XI]WO0062757 (BRITANNIA PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [GB], et al); | [XI]CN1575795 (TOXIC PHARMACEUTICS INST P L A [CN]); | other | WO8203768 | WO0062757 | CN1575795 | US2006009447 | Opposition | WO8203768 | WO0062757 | CN1575795 |