EP2715853 - MICRO-TUBULAR SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The European Union, represented by the European Commission Rue de la Loi, 200 1049 Brussels / BE | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSOTRIDIS, Georgios Lievenshof 7 Alkmaar KH 1816 / NL | 02 /
WINKLER, Wolfgang Laßrönner Dorfstr. 22 21423 Winsen / DE | [2014/47] |
Former [2014/15] | 01 /
TSOTRIDIS, Georgios Lievenshof 7 Alkmaar KH 1816 / NL | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2014/15] | Application number, filing date | 12722168.7 | 23.05.2012 | [2015/35] | WO2012EP59618 | Priority number, date | EP20110167086 | 23.05.2011 Original published format: EP 11167086 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012160102 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2715853 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2715853 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/24, H01M8/02 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
H01M8/0252 (EP,US);
H01M8/24 (KR);
H01M8/0247 (US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M8/12 (KR);
H01M8/243 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKRORÖHRENFÖRMIGE FESTBRENNSTOFFZELLENANORDNUNG | [2014/15] | English: | MICRO-TUBULAR SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL ARRANGEMENT | [2014/15] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE À OXYDE SOLIDE MICRO-TUBULAIRE | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2012 | AL | 26.08.2015 | AT | 26.08.2015 | BE | 26.08.2015 | BG | 26.08.2015 | CY | 26.08.2015 | CZ | 26.08.2015 | DK | 26.08.2015 | EE | 26.08.2015 | FI | 26.08.2015 | HR | 26.08.2015 | LT | 26.08.2015 | LV | 26.08.2015 | MC | 26.08.2015 | MK | 26.08.2015 | PL | 26.08.2015 | RO | 26.08.2015 | RS | 26.08.2015 | SI | 26.08.2015 | SK | 26.08.2015 | SM | 26.08.2015 | TR | 26.08.2015 | NO | 26.11.2015 | GR | 27.11.2015 | IS | 26.12.2015 | PT | 28.12.2015 | IE | 23.05.2016 | LU | 23.05.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 23.05.2012 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
BG | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.05.2016 | ||
LU | 23.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.05.2012 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.05.2016 | ||
LU | 23.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.05.2012 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
TR | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.05.2016 | ||
LU | 23.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.05.2012 | |
AT | 26.08.2015 | ||
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CY | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
MC | 26.08.2015 | ||
MK | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
SM | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.05.2016 | ||
LU | 23.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
IE | 23.05.2016 | ||
LU | 23.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
BE | 26.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SI | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RO | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
SK | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
CZ | 26.08.2015 | ||
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
EE | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
DK | 26.08.2015 | ||
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 26.08.2015 | |
FI | 26.08.2015 | ||
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
HR | 26.08.2015 | ||
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
PL | 26.08.2015 | ||
RS | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
IS | 26.12.2015 | ||
PT | 28.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 26.08.2015 | |
LT | 26.08.2015 | ||
LV | 26.08.2015 | ||
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
GR | 27.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 26.08.2015 | |
NO | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 26.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0562724 (CERAMATEC INC [US]) [Y] 1-11 * claims 1,2,4 * * figures 1,2,7,8 * * page 3, lines 21-23, 46-48 * * page 4, lines 4-5, 46-54 * * page 6, lines 33-34, 39-41 * * page 7, lines 10-11 *; | [Y]EP1328034 (H2 INTERPOWER BRENNSTOFFZELLEN [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * claims 6,8,12 * * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0018] , [0023] *; | [Y]US2004023101 (JACOBSON CRAIG P [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * claims 1,9,18 * * figures 6-15 * * paragraph [0080] * | by applicant | JP4407235B |