EP2729227 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF TRISILYLAMINE FROM MONOCHLOROSILANE AND AMMONIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOPPE, Carl-Friedrich Oberlausitzer Str. 10 63584 Gründau / DE | 02 /
RAULEDER, Hartwig Uhlandweg 51A 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 03 /
LUNT-RIEG, Ingrid Lange Meile 8a 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 04 /
GÖTZ, Christian Lerchenweg 1b 63500 Seligenstadt / DE | [2014/20] | Application number, filing date | 12722330.3 | 15.05.2012 | [2016/47] | WO2012EP59019 | Priority number, date | DE20111078749 | 06.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011078749 | [2014/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013004423 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2729227 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2729227 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/14, B01J8/00, C01B21/087, C07F7/10 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
C01B21/087 (EP,KR,US);
C07F7/10 (KR);
B01D3/14 (KR);
B01J19/24 (US);
B01J8/00 (KR);
C01B33/043 (EP,US);
C01C1/164 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TRISILYLAMIN AUS MONOCHLORSILAN UND AMMONIAK | [2014/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF TRISILYLAMINE FROM MONOCHLOROSILANE AND AMMONIA | [2014/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE TRISILYLAMINE À PARTIR DE MONOCHLOROSILANE ET D'AMMONIAQUE | [2014/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 09.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2012 | AL | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | IT | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | MK | 23.11.2016 | MT | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | RS | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | SM | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | NO | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | AT | 15.05.2017 | GB | 15.05.2017 | IE | 15.05.2017 | LU | 15.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
AT | 15.05.2017 | ||
GB | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
AT | 15.05.2017 | ||
GB | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
AT | 15.05.2017 | ||
GB | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
AT | 15.05.2017 | ||
GB | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MT | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
AT | 15.05.2017 | ||
GB | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
AT | 15.05.2017 | ||
GB | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 15.05.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 23.11.2016 | |
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 23.11.2016 | |
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2010141551 (VOLTAIX LLC [US], et al) [AD] 1-6 * paragraphs [0031] , [0041] , [0045] , [0049] *; | [A] - ALFRED STOCK; KARL SOMIESKI, "Siliciumwasserstoffe, X.: Stickstoffhaltige Verbindungen", BER. DTSCH. CHEM. GES., (1921), vol. 54, pages 740 - 758, XP002680324 [A] 1-6 * pages 745-751 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cber.19210540424 | [A] - L.G.L. WARD, "BROMOSILANE, IODOSILANE, AND TRISILYLAMINE", INORGANIC SYNTHESIS, (1968), vol. XI, pages 159 - 170, XP002680325 [A] 1-6 * pages 168-169 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9780470132425.ch35 | by applicant | US4200666 | JPS6196741 | EP1547138 | WO2010141551 | WO2011049811 | - ALFRED STOCK; KARL SOMIESKI, BER. DTSCH. CHEM. GES., (1921), vol. 54, page 740 FF | - RICHARD L. WELLS; RILEY SCHAEFFER, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1966), vol. 88, page 37 FF |