EP2714470 - ASSEMBLY FOR ADJUSTING THE OUTSIDE MIRROR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMR Patents S.à.r.l. Le Dôme 2-8 Avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERRMANN, Andreas In der Au 29 71364 Winnenden-Baach / DE | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Weber-Bruls, Dorothée Jones Day Nextower Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/15] | Application number, filing date | 12722377.4 | 21.05.2012 | [2016/46] | WO2012EP59396 | Priority number, date | DE201110103198 | 31.05.2011 Original published format: DE102011103198 | [2014/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012163717 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2714470 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2714470 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/072, B29C45/14, B29L31/30 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
B60R1/072 (EP,US);
B29C45/14 (US);
B29C45/14467 (EP,US);
B29L2031/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/15] | B60R1/072 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUGRUPPE ZUR VERSTELLUNG DES AUSSENSPIEGELS | [2014/15] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR ADJUSTING THE OUTSIDE MIRROR | [2014/15] | French: | MODULE PERMETTANT DE RÉGLER UN RÉTROVISEUR EXTÉRIEUR | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 17.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2012 | AL | 16.11.2016 | CY | 16.11.2016 | CZ | 16.11.2016 | DK | 16.11.2016 | EE | 16.11.2016 | ES | 16.11.2016 | FI | 16.11.2016 | HR | 16.11.2016 | IT | 16.11.2016 | LT | 16.11.2016 | LV | 16.11.2016 | MC | 16.11.2016 | MK | 16.11.2016 | MT | 16.11.2016 | NL | 16.11.2016 | PL | 16.11.2016 | RO | 16.11.2016 | RS | 16.11.2016 | SE | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | SK | 16.11.2016 | SM | 16.11.2016 | TR | 16.11.2016 | BG | 16.02.2017 | NO | 16.02.2017 | GR | 17.02.2017 | IS | 16.03.2017 | PT | 16.03.2017 | AT | 21.05.2017 | IE | 21.05.2017 | LU | 21.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
MT | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
TR | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
AT | 21.05.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
MT | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
AT | 21.05.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MT | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
AT | 21.05.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MT | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
AT | 21.05.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MT | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
AT | 21.05.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
AT | 21.05.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 21.05.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 21.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 16.11.2016 | |
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | ES | 16.11.2016 | |
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 16.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [IY]DE3120627 (FRESE METALLWERK [DE]) [I] 1,3,8 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2,4-7; | [Y]EP2208643 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2,4,5 * paragraph [0013] * * claims 1,6 *; | [Y]DE102009022238 (KRAUSS MAFFEI TECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6,7 * paragraph [0003] * | by applicant | DE3120627 | DE4018409 | WO2005095159 | EP2208643 | WO03004245 | DE102009022238 | EP1412158 |