EP2709943 - A FOLDABLE GANTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reid Lifting Limited Unit 1 Severnlink Newhouse Farm Industrial Estate Chepstow Monmouthshire NP16 6UN / GB | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITALIANO, Peter c/o Reid Lifting Limited Unit 1 Severnlink Newhouse Farm Industrial Estate Chepstow, Monmouthshire NP16 6UN / GB | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Howell, Matthew Dafydd, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [2014/13] | Application number, filing date | 12722819.5 | 16.05.2012 | WO2012GB51102 | Priority number, date | GB20110008335 | 18.05.2011 Original published format: GB 201108335 | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012156741 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2709943 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2709943 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B66C19/02 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
B66C19/02 (EP,GB,US);
B66C11/04 (GB);
B25H1/06 (US);
B66C9/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLAPPGERÜST | [2014/13] | English: | A FOLDABLE GANTRY | [2014/13] | French: | PORTIQUE REPLIABLE | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 10.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15159939.6 / EP2907785 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2012 | AL | 17.06.2015 | AT | 17.06.2015 | BE | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | ES | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | HR | 17.06.2015 | IT | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | MK | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | RS | 17.06.2015 | SE | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | SM | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | NO | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.05.2012 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.05.2012 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.05.2012 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SE | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3741338 (DURAND P, et al) [X] 1,2,4-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 22 - line 36 * [I] 14,15; | [A]US4648778 (SCHULTZ LESTER W [US]) [A] 1,13* abstract *; | [XAY]US4690248 (KILLEEN WALTER H [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * column 7, line 34 - line 51 * [A] 15 [Y] 16,17; | [IAY]US4770273 (MCMAKIN WILLIAM H [US], et al) [I] 14 * abstract * [A] 1 [Y] 16,17 |