EP2699380 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A LASER CUTTING PROCESS AND LASER CUTTING SYSTEM IMPLEMENTING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adige S.p.A. Via per Barco, 11 38056 Levico Terme (TN) / IT | [2016/30] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Adige S.p.A. Via Per Barco, 11 38056 Levico Terme / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SBETTI, Maurizio Vicolo del Crocefisso 36 I-38056 LEVICO TERME (Trento) / IT | 02 /
BERTOLDI, Stefano Via Gramatica 3 I-38057 PERGINE VALSUGANA (Trento) / IT | 03 /
COLOMBO, Daniele Via Garibaldi 60 I-20838 RENATE (Monza-Brianza) / IT | 04 /
PREVITALI, Barbara Via Sandro Pertini 11 I-24040 BONATE SOPRA (Bergamo) / IT | 05 /
RIVA, Giovanni Via San Gerolamo 89 I-23808 VERCURAGO (Lecco) / IT | 06 /
DANESI, Matteo Via Pietro Zocchi Alberti 4 I-25018 MONTICHIARI (Brescia) / IT | 07 /
MOLINARI TOSATTI, Lorenzo Via Mazzini 23 I-24128 Bergamo / IT | 08 /
PARAZZOLI, Diego Via Tolstoj 1 I-20146 Milano / IT | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Rondano, Davide, et al Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2014/09] | Application number, filing date | 12722866.6 | 20.04.2012 | [2016/30] | WO2012IB51992 | Priority number, date | IT2011TO00352 | 21.04.2011 Original published format: IT TO20110352 | [2014/09] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012143899 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2699380 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2699380 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2699380 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/38, B23K26/03 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
B23K26/032 (EP,CN,US);
B23K26/38 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B23K26/12 (US);
B23K26/03 (KR,RU);
B23K26/04 (KR);
B23K26/0622 (EP,CN,US);
B23K26/064 (CN);
B23K26/123 (EP,CN,US);
B23K26/14 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEURUNG EINES LASERSCHNEIDPROZESSES UND ZUGEHÖRIGE LASERSCHNEIDEINRICHTUNG | [2016/07] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A LASER CUTTING PROCESS AND LASER CUTTING SYSTEM IMPLEMENTING THE SAME | [2014/09] | French: | MÉTHODE DE CONTRÔLE D'UN PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCOUPE AU LASER ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉCOUPE AU LASER CORRESPONDANT | [2016/07] |
Former [2014/09] | VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG EINES LASERSCHNEIDPROZESSES UND LASERSCHNEIDSYSTEM DAMIT | ||
Former [2014/09] | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER UN PROCESSUS DE DÉCOUPE PAR LASER ET SYSTÈME DE DÉCOUPE PAR LASER METTANT EN UVRE CE PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 12.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.07.2016 | AT | 27.07.2016 | BE | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | RS | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | IE | 20.04.2017 | LU | 20.04.2017 | MT | 20.04.2017 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/46] | AL | 27.07.2016 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.04.2017 | ||
LU | 20.04.2017 | ||
MT | 20.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 27.07.2016 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.04.2017 | ||
LU | 20.04.2017 | ||
MT | 20.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.04.2017 | ||
LU | 20.04.2017 | ||
MT | 20.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
IE | 20.04.2017 | ||
LU | 20.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
LU | 20.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0470583 (AMADA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10 * abstract *; | [XI]US5373135 (BEYER ECKHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,10,11 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 46; figure - * [I] 6-9,12-14; | [X]DE19607376 (THYSSEN LASER TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,10* abstract * | by applicant | US5373135 |