22.06.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
11.03.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.09.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.09.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
01.09.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
01.09.2017 |
Change - German title |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
01.09.2017 |
Change - English title |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
01.09.2017 |
Change - French title |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
10.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.06.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.12.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.08.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.08.2014 |
First examination report |
|
11.07.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
11.07.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
17.06.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.06.2014 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
04.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.02.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
14.02.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
12.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.04.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|