Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014248442 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP59437 | 22.05.2012 | EP11167044 | 23.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140096994 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP59437 | 22.05.2012 | EP11167044 | 23.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014525820 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP59437 | 22.05.2012 | EP11167044 | 23.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103596878 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP59437 | 22.05.2012 | EP11167044 | 23.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2714590 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2015 | B1 | EP2714590 | 09.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12723643 | 22.05.2012 | WO2012EP59437 | 22.05.2012 | EP11167044 | 23.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2539686T | 03.07.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP59437 | 22.05.2012 | EP11167044 | 23.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012160041 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11167044 | 23.05.2011 |