EP2714590 - INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR THE FUNCTIONALIZATION OF PARTICULATE AND POWDERED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanocyl S.A. Rue de l'Essor 4 5060 Sambreville / BE | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUIZI, Frédéric Rue du Broctia 25 5020 MALONNE / BE | 02 /
MINEA, Tiberiu Marian Rue Charles Marie Widor 6 75016 PARIS / FR | 03 /
LUCAS, Stéphane Place Saint Pierre 11 5380 FORVILLE / BE | 04 /
AMADOU, Julien Rue de Mettet 3 5640 SAINT GERARD / BE | 05 /
USOLTSEVA, Anna Rue du Collège 2 5000 NAMUR / BE | 06 /
RIGAUX, Christophe Avenue du Parc d'Amée 126 5100 JAMBES / BE | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Pronovem Office Van Malderen Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme- bâtiment K Square des Conduites d'Eau 1-2 4020 Liège / BE | [2014/15] | Application number, filing date | 12723643.8 | 22.05.2012 | WO2012EP59437 | Priority number, date | EP20110167044 | 23.05.2011 Original published format: EP 11167044 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012160041 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2714590 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2714590 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/18, C01B33/04, C01B33/40 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
B01J19/08 (KR);
B01J19/088 (EP,US);
B01J8/12 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/05 (KR);
C01B32/174 (EP,US);
C01B32/21 (EP,US);
C01B33/18 (EP,US);
C01B33/40 (EP,US);
C23C16/4417 (US);
C23C16/50 (US);
D06M10/025 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0869 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0879 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/15] | C01B31/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR FUNKTIONALISIERUNG VON PARTIKELFÖRMIGEN UND PULVERFÖRMIGEN PRODUKTEN | [2014/15] | English: | INSTALLATION AND METHOD FOR THE FUNCTIONALIZATION OF PARTICULATE AND POWDERED PRODUCTS | [2014/15] | French: | INSTALLATION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FONCTIONNALISATION DE PRODUITS PARTICULAIRES ET PULVÉRULENTS | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 17.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2012 | AL | 18.03.2015 | AT | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | IT | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MK | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | RS | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | SM | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | IE | 22.05.2015 | LU | 22.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | NO | 18.06.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.05.2012 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MK | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 22.05.2015 | ||
LU | 22.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 22.05.2012 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 22.05.2015 | ||
LU | 22.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 22.05.2015 | ||
LU | 22.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 22.05.2015 | ||
LU | 22.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 22.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | |
NO | 18.06.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102009005053 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [AD] 1-12 * paragraphs [0007] - [0014] - [0064] - [0068]; figures 1-2; claims 1-11 *; | [A] - FELTEN A ET AL, "Radio-frequency plasma functionalization of carbon nanotubes surface O2, NH3, and CF4 treatments", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (20051007), vol. 98, no. 7, doi:10.1063/1.2071455, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 74308 - 074308, XP012078724 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2071455 | [A] - NASEH M V ET AL, "Fast and clean functionalization of carbon nanotubes by dielectric barrier discharge plasma in air compared to acid treatment", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 48, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.CARBON.2009.12.027, ISSN 0008-6223, (20100401), pages 1369 - 1379, (20091216), XP026893505 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2009.12.027 | [A] - UTEGULOV ZHANDOS ET AL, "Functionalization of single-walled carbon nanotubes using isotropic plasma treatment: Resonant Raman spectroscopy study", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (20050510), vol. 97, no. 10, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 104324 - 104324, XP012069425 [A] 1-12 * [ II Experiment];; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2010081747 |