EP2716120 - WIRELESS NETWORK ELEMENT, INTEGRATED CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR REDUCING INTERFERENCE CAUSED BY A BROADCAST BASE STATION TO A BI-DIRECTIONAL BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures Holding 81 LLC 7251 W Lake Mead Boulevard, Suite 300 Las Vegas, NV 89128 / US | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, William John Meadow Vale Dauntsey Chippenham Wiltshire SN15 4JH / GB | 02 /
WILKINSON, Timothy 24 Clifton Wood Crescent Bristol BS8 4TH / GB | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/15] | Application number, filing date | 12724298.0 | 01.05.2012 | WO2012EP57953 | Priority number, date | GB20110008743 | 25.05.2011 Original published format: GB 201108743 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012159853 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2716120 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/08, H04W72/00 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04W16/14 (GB);
H04W72/02 (US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W28/04 (GB);
H04W72/30 (US);
H04W72/541 (GB);
H04W72/542 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES NETZWERKELEMENT, INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER INTERFERENZ EINER RUNDFUNKBASISSTATION AN EINE BIDIREKTIONALE BASISSTATION | [2014/15] | English: | WIRELESS NETWORK ELEMENT, INTEGRATED CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR REDUCING INTERFERENCE CAUSED BY A BROADCAST BASE STATION TO A BI-DIRECTIONAL BASE STATION | [2014/15] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE RÉSEAU SANS FIL, CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE L'INTERFÉRENCE PROVOQUÉE PAR UNE STATION DE BASE DE DIFFUSION AVEC UNE STATION DE BASE BIDIRECTIONNELLE | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 22.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2010105232 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [YA]US2010322227 (LUO TAO [US]); | [A]US2011090885 (SAFAVI SAEID [US]) |