|
10.11.2017 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
01.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.04.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
46 |
|
24.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.08.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2015 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.09.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
13 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |