19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
10.11.2017 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
26.07.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
26.07.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
26.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
23.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
08.12.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
08.11.2016 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
12.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
03.07.2016 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
27.05.2016 |
Opposition filed |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
04.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
24.07.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
20.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.07.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.03.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.03.2015 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
19.03.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.03.2015 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
16.01.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
16.01.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
15.08.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
29.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
14.03.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
18.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|