Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9080604 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2015 | B2 | US2014177989 | 26.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011077278 | 09.06.2011 | WO2012EP59853 | 25.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101879475B | Global Dossier | 18.07.2018 | B1 | KR20140045445 | 16.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102011077278 | 09.06.2011 | WO2012EP59853 | 25.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014516144 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102011077278 | 09.06.2011 | WO2012EP59853 | 25.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103620245B | Global Dossier | 10.02.2016 | B | CN103620245 | 05.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102011077278 | 09.06.2011 | WO2012EP59853 | 25.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2718577 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2015 | B1 | EP2718577 | 16.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011077278 | 09.06.2011 | WO2012EP59853 | 25.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013031639 | 21.03.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102011077278 | 09.06.2011 | WO2012EP59853 | 25.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012168096 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011077278 | 09.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102011077278 | 25.10.2012 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102011077278 | 09.06.2011 |