EP2699408 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/09] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT AND STEREOLITHOGRAPHY MACHINE EMPLOYING SAID METHOD | ||
[2016/14] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 31.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Petition for review: decision | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DWS S.R.L. Via Della Meccanica, 21 36016 Thiene (VI) / IT | [2017/02] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Dws S.R.L. Via Lago di Levico 3 36010 Zane' (VI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSTABEBER, Ettore, Maurizio Via Lago di Levico 1 I-36010 Zane (VI) / IT | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Bonini, Ercole Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2014/09] | Bonini, Ercole Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 12724706.2 | 19.04.2012 | [2016/50] | WO2012IB00776 | Priority number, date | IT2011VI00099 | 20.04.2011 Original published format: IT VI20110099 | [2014/09] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012143786 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2699408 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2699408 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
B29C64/214 (EP,US);
B29C67/00 (KR);
B29C64/124 (EP,US);
B29C64/135 (EP,US);
B29C64/245 (EP,US);
B29C64/255 (EP,US);
B29C64/264 (US);
B29C64/268 (EP,US);
B29C64/321 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTS | [2016/14] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT | [2016/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2016/14] |
Former [2014/09] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTS SOWIE STEREOLITHOGRAPHIEMASCHINE ZUR ANWENDUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | ||
Former [2014/09] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT AND STEREOLITHOGRAPHY MACHINE EMPLOYING SAID METHOD | ||
Former [2014/09] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL ET MACHINE DE STÉRÉOLITHOGRAPHIE EMPLOYANT LEDIT PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 23.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16195931.7 / EP3159148 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.09.2017
12.10.2023
WITHDRAWN Formlabs Inc. 35 Medford Street, Suite 201 Somerville, MA 02143 / US Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/52] |
Former [2017/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.09.2017
19.09.2017
ADMISSIBLE Formlabs Inc. 35 Medford Street, Suite 201 Somerville, MA 02143 / US Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 06.10.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.02.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.02.2019 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.09.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/10] | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 18.04.2019 | Appeal received No. T1213/19 | 24.06.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.09.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 22.12.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 23.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Petition(s) for review: | 22.02.2023 | Petition for review received | Number: R0002/23 | for appeal No. T1213/19-3205 | Petitioner: APPR | 05.03.2024 | Decision: Petition for review obviously inadmissible (not deemed to be filed) or simultaneously obviously inadmissible and obviously unsubstantiated. | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2012 | AL | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | IE | 19.04.2017 | LU | 19.04.2017 | MT | 19.04.2017 | AT | 19.04.2020 | FI | 19.04.2020 | GB | 19.04.2020 | ES | 20.04.2020 | SE | 20.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | FR | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | NL | 01.05.2020 | IS | 29.12.2021 | [2022/10] |
Former [2021/51] | HU | 19.04.2012 | |
AL | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
AT | 19.04.2020 | ||
FI | 19.04.2020 | ||
GB | 19.04.2020 | ||
ES | 20.04.2020 | ||
SE | 20.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | HU | 19.04.2012 | |
AL | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
AT | 19.04.2020 | ||
FI | 19.04.2020 | ||
GB | 19.04.2020 | ||
SE | 20.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | HU | 19.04.2012 | |
AL | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
AT | 19.04.2020 | ||
FI | 19.04.2020 | ||
SE | 20.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
NL | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | HU | 19.04.2012 | |
AL | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
AT | 19.04.2020 | ||
FI | 19.04.2020 | ||
SE | 20.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
FR | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | HU | 19.04.2012 | |
AL | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2020 | ||
SE | 20.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | HU | 19.04.2012 | |
AL | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.04.2012 | |
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.04.2012 | |
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.04.2012 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
MT | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 19.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 19.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | HR | 14.12.2016 | |
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0597114 (CMET INC [JP], et al) [Y] 3-5,8 * abstract * * column 9, line 27 - line 30 ** claims 1,9-13 *; | [IDY]WO2010045950 (IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG [LI], et al) [ID] 1,2,6,7,9 * abstract * * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 7 * * page 15, line 10 - line 25 * * page 23, line 6 - page 24, line 10 * * claim 13 * * figures 6,7 * [Y] 3-5,8 | Examination | JPH071594 | by applicant | WO2010045950 | Opposition | US4575330 | JPH04366618 | JPH0790603B | US5651934 | WO2010045950 |