EP2707774 - COATED CHASSIS FOR LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTISAUSKAS, Steven, J. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop MS 83-t Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
WURZEL, Joshua, G. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop MS 83-d Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
PAKULA, David, A. 1 Infinite Loop MS 305-idr Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
MOOLSINTONG, Pinida, J. 4 Ord Court San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Rooney, John-Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Rooney, John-Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12724841.7 | 25.05.2012 | WO2012US39690 | Priority number, date | US201113167663 | 23.06.2011 Original published format: US201113167663 | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012177360 | Date: | 27.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2707774 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, H04M1/02 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
G02F1/133308 (EP,US);
H04M1/0266 (EP,US);
G02F1/133334 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETER BAUGRUPPENTRÄGER FÜR FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE | [2014/12] | English: | COATED CHASSIS FOR LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY | [2014/12] | French: | CHÂSSIS REVÊTU POUR AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 17.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 25.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB2152761 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [X] 1-3,9,12,17-22 * page 1, line 6 - line 79 * * page 1, line 118 - line 121 * * page 2, line 6 - line 9 * * page 2, line 56 - line 71; figures 1,2 *[I] 5,6,13; | [XI]US5548084 (TRACY JAMES L [US]) [X] 1,8,17,18,22 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 40; figures 1,2 * [I] 5,13,23; | [XI]EP1727412 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4,8-10,14,15,18,22,24 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0023]; figures 3,4 * [I] 23 |