EP2721730 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wobben Properties GmbH Borsigstrasse 26 26607 Aurich / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2014/17] | For all designated states Wobben Properties GmbH Dreekamp 5 26605 Aurich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIEDRICHS, Volker Friedrich-Koopmann-Straße 30 26203 Wardenburg / DE | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2014/17] | Application number, filing date | 12724947.2 | 24.05.2012 | WO2012EP59782 | Priority number, date | DE20111077651 | 16.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011077651 | [2014/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012171769 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2721730 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02P29/00, H02P9/14, H02K19/26, H02K7/09, F03D7/02 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
H02P9/14 (EP,US);
F03D7/0272 (EP,US);
H02K19/26 (EP,US);
H02K7/09 (EP,US);
H02P29/50 (EP,US);
H02K2201/03 (EP,US);
H02K2213/03 (EP,US);
H02K2213/09 (EP,US);
H02K7/1838 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Extension states | BA | 24.02.2014 | ME | 24.02.2014 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER WINDENERGIEANLAGE | [2014/17] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A WIND TURBINE | [2014/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2014/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 16.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/22] | 22.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4319176 (AKAMATSU MASAHIKO) [X] 1-5,9-11,13-15 * column 2, lines 22-28; figures 1-7 * * column 3, lines 6-15 * * column 3, lines 40-46,54-58 * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 6 * [A] 6-8,12; | [A]DE19729034 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1-15* figures 1-25 *; | [X]DE102008002358 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 29,32 * | Examination | DE102006021498 | by applicant | DE102006056893 | - C. PATSIOS; A. CHANIOTIS; E. TSAMPOURIS; A. KLADAS, "Particular Electromagnetic Field Computation for Permanent Magnet Generator Wind Turbine Analysis", MAGNETICS, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON, (201008), vol. 46, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1109/TMAG.2010.2043345, pages 2751 - 2754, XP011313983 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMAG.2010.2043345 |