EP2707505 - SPECTRAL IMAGING FOR MEASUREMENT OF NUCLEAR PATHOLOGY FEATURES IN CANCER CELLS PREPARED FOR IN SITU ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ventana Medical Systems, Inc. 1910 Innovation Park Drive Tucson, AZ 85755 / US | For all designated states Cornell University Cornell Center for Technology Enterprise & Commercialization 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Ventana Medical Systems, Inc. 1910 Innovation Park Drive Tucson AZ 85755 / US | ||
For all designated states Cornell University Cornell Center for Technology Enterprise & Commercialization 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | |||
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Ventana Medical Systems, Inc. 1910 E. Innovation Park Drive Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US | ||
For all designated states Cornell University Cornell Center for Technology Enterprise & Commercialization 395 Pine Tree Road Suite 310 Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMICHELIS, Francesca 223 W. 14th Stree, Apt 4B New York New York 10011 / US | 02 /
GARSHA, Karl 15058 Theodore Roosevelt Way Sahuarita Arizona 85629 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Phillip C 1821 Calle Del Vaso Tucson Arizona 85737 / US | 04 /
NAGLE, Ray B 2027 E. Helen Street Tucson Arizona 85719 / US | 05 /
OTTER, Michael 11809 North Mountain Laurel Place Tucson Arizona 85737 / US | 06 /
PESTANO, Gary Anthony 2650 Ginny Way Lafayette CO 80026 / US | 07 /
RUBIN, Mark A. 520 W. 23rd Street (10A) New York New York 10011 / US | [2016/23] |
Former [2014/12] | 01 /
DEMICHELIS, Francesca 223 W. 14th Stree, Apt 4B New York New York 10011 / US | ||
02 /
GARSHA, Karl 15058 Theodore Roosevelt Way Sahuarita Arizona 85629 / US | |||
03 /
MILLER, Phillip C 1821 Calle Del Vaso Tucson Arizona 85737 / US | |||
04 /
NAGLE, Ray B 2027 E. Helen Street Tucson Arizona 85719 / US | |||
05 /
OTTER, Michael 11809 North Mountain Laurel Place Tucson Arizona 85737 / US | |||
06 /
PESTANO, Gary Anthony 11630 North Dragon Springs Drive Oro Valley Arizona 85737 / US | |||
07 /
RUBIN, Mark A. 520 W. 23rd Street (10A) New York New York 10011 / US | Representative(s) | Burger, Alexander Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Burger, Alexander Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12725639.4 | 07.05.2012 | [2016/23] | WO2012EP58356 | Priority number, date | US201161483928P | 09.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161483928 P | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012152747 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2707505 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2707505 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/574 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
H01H35/146 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/6841 (EP,US);
G01N33/57407 (EP,US);
G16B20/00 (EP,CN,US);
G16B20/20 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/572 (US);
H01M50/578 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/579 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/581 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,CN,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEKTRALBILDGEBUNG ZUR MESSUNG VON NUKLEARPATHOLOGISCHEN MERKMALEN IN KREBSZELLEN ZUR IN-SITU-ANALYSE | [2014/12] | English: | SPECTRAL IMAGING FOR MEASUREMENT OF NUCLEAR PATHOLOGY FEATURES IN CANCER CELLS PREPARED FOR IN SITU ANALYSIS | [2014/12] | French: | IMAGERIE SPECTRALE POUR LA MESURE DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES PATHOLOGIQUES DES NOYAUX DANS DES CELLULES CANCÉREUSES PRÉPARÉES POUR UNE ANALYSE IN-SITU | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 18.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2012 | AL | 08.06.2016 | AT | 08.06.2016 | BE | 08.06.2016 | BG | 08.06.2016 | CY | 08.06.2016 | CZ | 08.06.2016 | EE | 08.06.2016 | FI | 08.06.2016 | HR | 08.06.2016 | LT | 08.06.2016 | LV | 08.06.2016 | MC | 08.06.2016 | MK | 08.06.2016 | NL | 08.06.2016 | PL | 08.06.2016 | RO | 08.06.2016 | RS | 08.06.2016 | SE | 08.06.2016 | SI | 08.06.2016 | SK | 08.06.2016 | SM | 08.06.2016 | TR | 08.06.2016 | NO | 08.09.2016 | GR | 09.09.2016 | IS | 08.10.2016 | PT | 10.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 07.05.2012 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
MK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.05.2012 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CY | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 07.05.2012 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
BG | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.05.2012 | |
AL | 08.06.2016 | ||
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 08.06.2016 | |
AT | 08.06.2016 | ||
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
MC | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SI | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 08.06.2016 | |
BE | 08.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
SM | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
PT | 10.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 08.06.2016 | |
CZ | 08.06.2016 | ||
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
PL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
SK | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
IS | 08.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 08.06.2016 | |
EE | 08.06.2016 | ||
FI | 08.06.2016 | ||
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RO | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
NL | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
SE | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
GR | 09.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
HR | 08.06.2016 | ||
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
LV | 08.06.2016 | ||
RS | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 08.06.2016 | |
LT | 08.06.2016 | ||
NO | 08.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 08.06.2016 | |
NO | 08.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5989811 (VELTRI ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,10-12 * example xiii *[I] 2,3,5,8,9 | Examination | US6025128 | US2010317002 |