EP2718716 - METHODS AND SYSTEM FOR THE AUTOMATED DETERMINATION OF IMMUNOFLUORESCENT FOCI USING A CELL-BASED IMMUNOFLUORESCENCE ASSAY USING SYNTHETIC CALIBRATION PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medipan GmbH Ludwig-Erhard-Ring 3 15827 Dahlewitz / DE | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROGGENBUCK, Dirk Fontanestr. 5 15344 Strausberg / DE | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Hertin, Paul W. Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [2016/12] |
Former [2014/16] | Hertin, Paul W. Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 12725755.8 | 04.06.2012 | [2016/12] | WO2012EP60499 | Priority number, date | EP20110168799 | 06.06.2011 Original published format: EP 11168799 | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012168184 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2718716 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2718716 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/54346 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/56972 (US);
G01N33/5308 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR DIE AUTOMATISCHE BESTIMMUNG VON IMMUNOFLUORESZENTEN FOCI MITHILFE EINES ZELLENBASIERTEN IMMUNFLUORESZENZTESTS ANHAND DER VERWENDUNG VON SYNTHETISCHEN KALIBRIERUNGSPARTIKELN | [2014/16] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEM FOR THE AUTOMATED DETERMINATION OF IMMUNOFLUORESCENT FOCI USING A CELL-BASED IMMUNOFLUORESCENCE ASSAY USING SYNTHETIC CALIBRATION PARTICLES | [2014/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈME POUR LA DÉTERMINATION AUTOMATIQUE DES FOCI IMMUNOFLUORESCENTS À L'AIDE D'UN DOSAGE CELLULAIRE D'IMMUNOFLUORESCENCE À L'AIDE DES PARTICULES DE CALIBRAGE SYNTHÉTIQUES | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 09.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2012 | AL | 23.03.2016 | AT | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | RS | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | IE | 04.06.2016 | LU | 04.06.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.06.2012 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
LU | 04.06.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.06.2012 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
LU | 04.06.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.06.2012 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.06.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003049866 (BUSHWAY PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0007] , [0025] , [0050] , [0060] , [0065] , [0068] , [0071] , [0074] , [0082] , [0083] , [0088]; claim 42 *; | [Y] - ERSOY ILKER ET AL, "Segmentation and classification of cell cycle phases in fluorescence imaging.", MEDICAL IMAGE COMPUTING AND COMPUTER-ASSISTED INTERVENTION : MICCAI ... INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MEDICAL IMAGE COMPUTING AND COMPUTER-ASSISTED INTERVENTION 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:20426163, (2009), vol. 12, no. Pt 2, pages 617 - 624, XP019130506 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - PARVIN BAHRAM ET AL, "Iterative voting for inference of structural saliency and characterization of subcellular events.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING : A PUBLICATION OF THE IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING SOCIETY MAR 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17357723, (200703), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 615 - 623, XP002663742 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 621; figure 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIP.2007.891154 | [Y] - DZYUBACHYK OLEH ET AL, "Automated analysis of time-lapse fluorescence microscopy images: from live cell images to intracellular foci.", BIOINFORMATICS (OXFORD, ENGLAND) 1 OCT 2010 LNKD- PUBMED:20702399, (20101001), vol. 26, no. 19, ISSN 1367-4811, pages 2424 - 2430, XP002663743 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/btq434 | [Y] - QVARNSTRÖM OLOV FREDRIK ET AL, "DNA double strand break quantification in skin biopsies.", RADIOTHERAPY AND ONCOLOGY : JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY FOR THERAPEUTIC RADIOLOGY AND ONCOLOGY SEP 2004 LNKD- PUBMED:15450730, (200409), vol. 72, no. 3, ISSN 0167-8140, pages 311 - 317, XP002665266 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [YA] - ABE SCHWARTZ ET AL, "Formalization of the MESF unit of fluorescence intensity", CYTOMETRY, (20040101), vol. 57B, no. 1, doi:10.1002/cyto.b.10066, ISSN 0196-4763, pages 1 - 6, XP055030813 [Y] 4-15 * abstract * [A] 1-3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.b.10066 | by applicant | - OLIVE PL; BANATH JP, "Phosphorylation of histone H2AX as a measure of radiosensitivity", INT J RADIAT ONCOL BIOL PHYS, (2004), vol. 58, pages 331 - 335 | - BANATH JP; MACPHAIL SH; OLIVE PL, "Radiation sensitivity, H2AX phosphorylation, and kinetics of repair of DNA strand breaks in irradiated cervical cancer cell lines", CANCER RES, (2004), vol. 64, pages 7144 - 7149 | - BANATH JP; FUSHIKI M; OLIVE PL, "Rejoining of DNA single- and double-strand breaks in human white blood cells exposed to ionizing radiation", INT J RADIAT BIOL, (1998), vol. 73, pages 649 - 660 | - FERNANDEZ-CAPETILLO O; ALLIS CD; NUSSENZWEIG A, "Phosphorylation of histone H2B at DNA double-strand breaks", J EXP MED, (2004), vol. 199, pages 1671 - 1677 | - FERNANDEZ-CAPETILLO O; CELESTE A; NUSSENZWEIG A, "Focusing on foci: H2AX and the recruitment of DNA-damage response factors", CELL CYCLE, (2003), vol. 2, pages 426 - 427 | - FOSTER HA; BRIDGER JM, "The genome and the nucleus: a marriage made by evolution. Genome organisation and nuclear architecture", CHROMOSOMA, (2005), vol. 114, doi:doi:10.1007/s00412-005-0016-6, pages 212 - 229, XP019426673 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00412-005-0016-6 | - FRANKENBERG-SCHWAGER M, "Review of repair kinetics for DNA damage induced in eukaryotic cells in vitro by ionizing radiation", RADIOTHER ONCOL, (1989), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/0167-8140(89)90143-6, pages 307 - 320, XP027309408 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-8140(89)90143-6 | - LOBRICH M; KIEFER J, "Assessing the likelihood of severe side effects in radiotherapy", INT J CANCER, (2006), vol. 118, pages 2652 - 2656 | - ROTHKAMM K; LOBRICH M, "Misrepair of radiation-induced DNA double-strand breaks and its relevance for tumorigenesis and cancer treatment (review).", INT J ONCOL, (2002), vol. 21, pages 433 - 440 | - ROGAKOU EP; NIEVES-NEIRA W; BOON C; POMMIER Y; BONNER WM, "Initiation of DNA fragmentation during apoptosis induces phosphorylation of H2AX histone at serine 139", J BIOL CHEM, (2000), vol. 275, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.275.13.9390, pages 9390 - 9395, XP000960404 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.275.13.9390 | - ROGAKOU EP; BOON C; REDON C; BONNER WM, "Megabase chromatin domains involved in DNA double-strand breaks in vivo", J CELL BIOL, (1999), vol. 146, pages 905 - 916 | - ROGAKOU EP; PILCH DR; ORR AH; IVANOVA VS; BONNER WM, "DNA double-stranded breaks induce histone H2AX phosphorylation on serine 139", J BIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.273.10.5858, pages 5858 - 5868, XP000960410 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.10.5858 | - KLOKOV D; MACPHAIL SM; BANATH JP; BYRNE JP; OLIVE PL, "Phosphorylated histone H2AX in relation to cell survival in tumor cells and xenografts exposed to single and fractionated doses of X-rays", RADIOTHER ONCOL, (2006), vol. 80, doi:doi:10.1016/j.radonc.2006.07.026, pages 223 - 229, XP027921834 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.radonc.2006.07.026 | - BOCKER W; ILIAKIS G, "Computational Methods for analysis of foci: validation for radiation-induced gamma-H2AX foci in human cells", RADIAT RES, (2006), vol. 165, pages 113 - 124 | - HOU YN; LAVAF A; HUANG D; PETERS S; HUQ R; FRIEDRICH V; ROSENSTEIN BS; KAO J, "Development of an automated gamma-H2AX immunocytochemistry assay", RADIAT RES, (2009), vol. 171, pages 360 - 367 | - AVONDOGLIO D; SCOTT T; KIL WJ; SPROULL M; TOFILON PJ; CAMPHAUSEN K, "High throughput evaluation of gamma-H2AX", RADIAT ONCOL, (2009), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1186/1748-717X-4-31, page 31, XP021060076 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1748-717X-4-31 | - COSTES SV; BOISSIERE A; RAVANI S; ROMANO R; PARVIN B; BARCELLOS-HOFF MH, "Imaging features that discriminate between foci induced by high- and low-LET radiation in human fibroblasts", RADIAT RES, (2006), vol. 165, pages 505 - 515 | - LOBRICH M; RIEF N; KUHNE M; HECKMANN M; FLECKENSTEIN J; RUBE C; UDER M, "In vivo formation and repair of DNA double-strand breaks after computed tomography examinations", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2005), vol. 102, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0501895102, pages 8984 - 8989, XP002448990 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0501895102 | - HIEMANN R; HILGER N; MICHEL J; NITSCHKE J; BOHM A; ANDERER U; WEIGERT M; SACK U, "Automatic analysis of immunofluorescence patterns of HEp-2 cells", ANN N YACAD SCI, (2007), vol. 1109, doi:doi:10.1196/annals.1398.042, pages 358 - 371, XP002564734 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1196/annals.1398.042 | - HIEMANN R; BUTTNER T; KRIEGER T; ROGGENBUCK D; SACK U; CONRAD K, "Challenges of automated screening and differentiation of non-organ specific autoantibodies on HEp-2 cells", AUTOIMMUN REV, (2009), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/j.autrev.2009.02.033, pages 17 - 22, XP026574984 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.autrev.2009.02.033 | - HIEMANN R; HILGER N; SACK U; WEIGERT M, "Objective quality evaluation of fluorescence images to optimize automatic image acquisition", CYTOMETRY A, (2006), vol. 69, pages 182 - 184 |