EP2855654 - STABILIZATION OF PHTHALIMIDO PERCARBOXYLIC ACIDS WITH DISACCHARIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecolab USA Inc. 1 Ecolab Place St. Paul, MN 55102 / US | [2017/35] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Ecolab USA Inc. 370 Wabasha Street N St. Paul, Minnesota 55102-1390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILIC, Amila Flurstraße 3 46047 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
WINTER, Johannes Georg Münchener Straße 89 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | Application number, filing date | 12726408.3 | 01.06.2012 | WO2012EP60449 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013178290 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2855654 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/22, C11D3/39, C11D17/06 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
C11D3/221 (EP);
C11D3/394 (EP);
C11D3/3945 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | STABILISIERUNG VON PHTHALIMIDPERCARBONSÄUREN MIT DISACCHARIDEN | [2015/15] | English: | STABILIZATION OF PHTHALIMIDO PERCARBOXYLIC ACIDS WITH DISACCHARIDES | [2015/15] | French: | STABILISATION D'ACIDES PHTALIMIDO PERCARBOXYLIQUES À L'AIDE DE DISACCHARIDES | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 02.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/37] | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008161218 (FREGONESE DANIELE [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,6-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0098] - [0102]; example 1; claims 1,5-10; tables A,B *; | [X]EP1760141 (SOLVAY [BE]) [X] 1,3,4,6-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0014] - [0016]; examples 1-7; claims 1-11; tables 1-4 *; | [X]WO2012066344 (RECKITT BENCKISER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,11-13 * examples 1,2; tables 1-4 * | by applicant | EP0325288 | EP0349940 | - J. CHEM. SOC., (1962), page 3821 | - CHEM. IND., (1961), page 469 |