EP2706983 - NOVEL PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vockner, Helmut Jodlfeld 4/4 6370 Kitzbühel / AT | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Loidl, Manuela Bettina, et al REDL Life Science Patent Attorneys Donau-City-Strasse 11 1220 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Loidl, Manuela Bettina, et al REDL Life Science Patent Attorneys Donau-City-Strasse 1 1220 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 12726753.2 | 11.05.2012 | WO2012EP58738 | Priority number, date | EP20110165857 | 12.05.2011 Original published format: EP 11165857 | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012152910 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2706983 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/06, A61K9/08, A61K9/14, A61K31/155, A61K31/593, A61P17/02 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61K31/353 (US);
A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K31/593 (EP,US);
A61K31/722 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/593, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/722, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | 12.11.2013 | ME | 12.11.2013 | Title | German: | NEUE PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNG | [2014/12] | English: | NOVEL PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATION | [2014/12] | French: | NOUVELLE FORMULATION PHARMACEUTIQUE | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 13.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 30.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CN1197643 (XIE RUIGANG [CN]) [X] 5,6,10-16 * the whole document *; | [X]KR100930326B (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]) [X] 1,3,4,7,10,12,14 * pages 9,18 *; | [XP]WO2011121062 (VOCKNER HELMUT [AT]) [XP] 5-8,10-17 * claims 1,3,12,18,19,20 *; | [A] - COHEN R E ET AL, "Effect of vitamin E gel, placebo gel and chlorhexidine on periodontal disease", CLINICAL PREVENTIVE DENTISTRY UNITED STATES 1991 SEP-OCT,, (19910901), vol. 13, no. 5, ISSN 0163-9633, pages 20 - 24, XP009152624 [A] 5-17 * the whole document * | [A] - KOIDE S S, "Chitin-chitosan: properties, benefits and risks", NUTRITION RESEARCH, ELSEVIER INC, XX, (19980601), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0271-5317, pages 1091 - 1101, XP009161185 [A] 1-4,7,12-16 * page 1097 - page 1098 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0271-5317(98)00091-8 | [A] - RAMESH K V ET AL, "A new role for vitamin D: Cholecalciferol prmotes dermal wound strenght and re-epithelization", INDIAN JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, COUNCIL OF SCIENTIFIC & INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH, IN, (19930901), vol. 31, ISSN 0019-5189, pages 778 - 779, XP002992050 [A] 14,15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2004122105 | JP2004210675 | JP2007084471 | WO2008073174 | - RUBIN, R.R; STADDON, J.M., ANNU REV NEUROSCI., (1999), vol. 22, pages 11 - 28 | - STADDON JM; RUBIN LL., CURR OPIN NEUROBIOL., (199610), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 622 - 7 | - GALLAGHER, K., J CLIN INVEST., (20070501), vol. 117, no. 5, pages 1249 - 1259 | - LLAVANERAS A. ET AL., J. PERIODONTOL., (2001), vol. 72, no. 8, pages 1069 - 1077 | - GREENWELL H.; BISSADA, N., DRUG, (2002), vol. 62, no. 18, pages 2681 - 2687 | - NOROWSKI P.; BAUMGARDNER J., J. BIOMED. MAT. RES., PAST B: APPLIED BIOMATERIALS, (2009), vol. 88, no. 2, pages 530 - 543 | - BADRAN Z. ET AL., ORAL HEALTH & PREVENTIVE DENTISTRY, (2009), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 3 - 12 | - RAMESH K.V. ET AL., INDIAN J. OF EXP. BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 31, pages 778 - 779 | - COHEN R.E. ET AL., CLINICAL PREVENTIVE DENTISTRY, (1991), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 20 - 24 | - YOON, K, JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 278, pages 15319 - 15325 | - HAUSLADEN, PRIVALLE ET AL., NAT. STRUCT. BIOL., (1996), vol. 5, pages 247 - 249 | - STAMLER; HAUSLADEN, CELL, (1998), vol. 86, pages 719 - 729 | - KSANDER BR, J IMMUNOL., (19901001), vol. 145, no. 7, pages 2057 - 63 | - KUBO TAKEKAZU, THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 173, pages 7249 - 7258 | - CHAPUY MC, OSTEOPOROS. INT., (200203), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 257 - 64 | - PEPPER C, BLOOD, (20030401), vol. 101, no. 7, pages 2454 - 60 | - PENNA G, J IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 164, pages 2405 - 11 | - BARRAT F J, J EXP MED, (2002), vol. 195, pages 603 - 16 | - GRIFFIN MD, J STEROID BIOCHEM MOL BIOL, (2004), vol. 89-90, pages 443 - 8 | - XING N, BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (2002), vol. 297, pages 645 - 52 | - ULEVITCH RJ, NAT REV IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 4, pages 512 - 520 | - MEDZHITOV R, N ENGL J MED, (2000), vol. 343, pages 338 - 344 | - HAJISHENGALLIS G, IMMUNOL INVEST, (2004), vol. 33, pages 157 - 172 | - GIBSON FC 3RD, CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 109, pages 2801 - 2806 | - MUTHUKURU M, INFECT IMMUN, (2005), vol. 73, pages 687 - 694 | - BAINBRIDGE BW, ACTA ODONTOLSCAND, (2001), vol. 59, pages 131 - 138 | - CALIXTO JB, PLANTA MED, (2003), vol. 69, pages 973 - 983 | - HAROKOPAKIS E, J PERIODONTOL, (2006), vol. 2, pages 271 - 279 | - GREENAWAY W, A REPORT OF WORK AT OXFORD, (1990), pages 117 - 118 | - XING X, THE FOOD INDUSTRY, (2008), page 01 | - SOCRANSKY, J CLIN PERIODONTOL, (1998), vol. 25, pages 134 - 44 | CN19971003254 |