EP2823693 - DEFLECTION DEVICE FOR DEFLECTING CHARGED PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/03] | DEFLECTION PLATE AND DEFLECTION DEVICE FOR DEFLECTING CHARGED PARTICLES | ||
[2018/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
APTAKER, Peter, Simon Cockleberry Farm Letcombe Basset Wantage Oxfordshire OX12 9LY / GB | 02 /
BEASLEY, Paul 3 Villeboys Close Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 3XP / GB | 03 /
HEID, Oliver Luitpoldstraße 63 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2015/03] | Application number, filing date | 12726780.5 | 31.05.2012 | [2019/19] | WO2012EP60279 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013178276 | Date: | 05.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2823693 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2823693 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05H7/00 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
H05H7/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/147 (US);
H01J2237/15 (RU,US);
H05H2007/002 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABLENKVORRICHTUNG ZUM ABLENKEN GELADENER TEILCHEN | [2018/52] | English: | DEFLECTION DEVICE FOR DEFLECTING CHARGED PARTICLES | [2018/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉFLEXION POUR LA DÉFLEXION DE PARTICULES CHARGÉES | [2018/52] |
Former [2015/03] | ABLENKPLATTE UND ABLENKVORRICHTUNG ZUM ABLENKEN GELADENER TEILCHEN | ||
Former [2015/03] | DEFLECTION PLATE AND DEFLECTION DEVICE FOR DEFLECTING CHARGED PARTICLES | ||
Former [2015/03] | PLAQUE DÉFLECTRICE ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉFLEXION POUR LA DÉFLEXION DE PARTICULES CHARGÉES | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 29.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2012 | AL | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | HR | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | RS | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | AT | 31.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | IE | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | LU | 31.05.2019 | FR | 08.07.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | GB | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | DE | 03.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 31.05.2012 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 31.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
IE | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GB | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 03.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 31.05.2012 | |
AL | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 31.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
IE | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GB | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 03.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 31.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
IE | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GB | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 03.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 31.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
IE | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GB | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 03.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
AT | 31.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
IE | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GB | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 03.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
IE | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GB | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 03.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
IE | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 08.07.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 03.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
IE | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 03.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
IE | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
DE | 03.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
IE | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
LU | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RS | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 08.05.2019 | |
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
HR | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X] - E.S.MASUNOV ET AL, "Space Charge Effects and RF Focusing of Ribbon Beam in Ion Linac", PROBLEMS OF ATOMIC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY. 2001-NO. 5.SERIES: NUCLEAR PHYSICS RESEARCH (39), (2001), pages 71 - 73, XP002697321 [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * | [XP] - J.EGBERTS ET AL, "Design and Test of the LIPAc IPM", PROCEEDINGS OF BIW2012, NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA, USA, (201211), ISBN 978-3-95450-121-2, XP002697322 [XP] 1-11 * page 2, column 1; figure 2 * | [X] - O.A.ANDERSON ET AL, "A Transverse-field-focussing (TFF) Accelerator for intense Ribbon Beams", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, (198308), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 3215 - 3217, XP002697323 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNS.1983.4336619 | [X] - M.POGGI ET AL, "two-dimensional ionization Beam Profile Measurement", PROCEEDINGD OF DIPAC09 BASEL SWITZERLAND, (200909), pages 384 - 386, XP002697324 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 384, column 2 * |