Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
06.01.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.07.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
31.10.2014 | Change - extension states | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
11.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant | |
12.06.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.06.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
12.06.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.05.2014 | Change - inventor | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
23.05.2014 | Change - applicant | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
23.05.2014 | Change - inventor | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
21.02.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] |
21.02.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] |
27.12.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.12.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.11.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.12.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.11.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.06.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |