Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2709862 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012GB00418 | 08.05.2012 | GB201108598 | 20.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012160323 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2013 | A3 | WO2012160323 | 29.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201108598 | 20.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201108598D0 | 06.07.2011 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201108598 | 20.05.2011 |