Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9771287 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2017 | B2 | US2014124438 | 08.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161483079 | 06.05.2011 | US201214115355 | 05.06.2012 | WO2012IB00884 | 06.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL229191 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US201161483079 | 06.05.2011 | WO2012IB00884 | 06.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2704999 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2019 | B1 | EP2704999 | 12.03.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161483079 | 06.05.2011 | WO2012IB00884 | 06.05.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012153174 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2013 | A3 | WO2012153174 | 15.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161483079 | 06.05.2011 |