EP2704999 - Wastewater treatment method comprising algal photosynthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/11] | WASTEWATER TREATMENT METHOD AND DEVICE | ||
[2018/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ariel-University Research and Development Company, Ltd Building 3A Kiryat Hamada Ariel University Center of Samaria 40700 Ariel / IL | [2014/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANKER, Yaakov 146 45885 Salit / IL | 02 /
KATZ, Erez 100 45885 Salit / IL | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/08] | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton, York YO26 6QY / GB | ||
Former [2014/11] | Harrison IP Limited Box Tree House Northminster Business Park York, Yorkshire YO26 6QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12726855.5 | 06.05.2012 | [2019/08] | WO2012IB00884 | Priority number, date | US201161483079P | 06.05.2011 Original published format: US 201161483079 P | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012153174 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2704999 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2704999 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/30, C02F3/32, // C02F101/20, C02F101/30, C02F103/00, C02F103/20, C02F103/32 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
C02F3/302 (EP,US);
C02F3/30 (US);
C02F3/322 (EP,US);
C02F2101/20 (EP,US);
C02F2101/30 (EP,US);
C02F2103/005 (EP,US);
C02F2103/20 (EP,US);
C02F2103/327 (EP,US);
C02F2303/24 (EP,US);
Y02W10/37 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/11] | C02F3/30, C02F3/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abwasserbehandlung mit Algen-Photosynthese | [2018/37] | English: | Wastewater treatment method comprising algal photosynthesis | [2018/37] | French: | Procédé de traitement des eaux usées comprenant une photosynthèse par des algues | [2018/37] |
Former [2014/11] | VERFAHREN ZUR ABWASSERBEHANDLUNG UND VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2014/11] | WASTEWATER TREATMENT METHOD AND DEVICE | ||
Former [2014/11] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES EAUX USÉES | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 08.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.07.2018 | 06.07.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 26.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2012 | AL | 20.02.2019 | AT | 20.02.2019 | CY | 20.02.2019 | CZ | 20.02.2019 | DK | 20.02.2019 | EE | 20.02.2019 | ES | 20.02.2019 | FI | 20.02.2019 | HR | 20.02.2019 | IT | 20.02.2019 | LT | 20.02.2019 | LV | 20.02.2019 | MC | 20.02.2019 | MK | 20.02.2019 | MT | 20.02.2019 | NL | 20.02.2019 | PL | 20.02.2019 | RO | 20.02.2019 | RS | 20.02.2019 | SE | 20.02.2019 | SI | 20.02.2019 | SK | 20.02.2019 | SM | 20.02.2019 | TR | 20.02.2019 | IE | 06.05.2019 | LU | 06.05.2019 | BG | 20.05.2019 | NO | 20.05.2019 | GR | 21.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | IS | 20.06.2019 | PT | 20.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.05.2012 | |
AL | 20.02.2019 | ||
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
MT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.05.2019 | ||
LU | 06.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.05.2012 | |
AL | 20.02.2019 | ||
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.05.2019 | ||
LU | 06.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.05.2019 | ||
LU | 06.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.05.2019 | ||
LU | 06.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 06.05.2019 | ||
LU | 06.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 06.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 20.02.2019 | |
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.02.2019 | |
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NL | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3973043 (LYNN HOWARD D) [A] 1-56 * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 61; figure 1 *; | [A]US4267038 (THOMPSON WORTHINGTON J) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 18 - line 27; figure 2 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 7 * * column 8, line 16 - line 41 *; | [I]WO0234680 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [I] 1-56 * page 2, line 17 - line 34; figure 1 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 9 * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 7 *; | [X]WO2005033019 (AQUATIC EVOLUTION INTERNAT [US], et al) [X] 1-56 * page 11, paragraph 2; figure 1a * * page 47, paragraph 2 * * page 51, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5 *; | [A]US2008176304 (LEE JAMES WEIFU [US]) [A] 1-56 * claims 92,94,96 *; | [A]US2010012580 (OTT CHRISTOPHER [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0076] *; | [AP]WO2011068745 (AQUATECH BIOENERGY LLC [US], et al) [AP] 1-9 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0050] ** paragraph [0054] *; | [AP]WO2012019338 (SHENGTAIJIE ENVIRONMENTAL PROT TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN], et al) [AP] 1-56 * figure 1; example 1; claims 1-9 * | Examination | US2010288695 | - Beatriz Molinuevo-Salces ET AL, "Performance comparison of two photobioreactors configurations (open and closed to the atmosphere) treating anaerobically degraded swine slurry", BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY., GB, (20100701), vol. 101, no. 14, doi:10.1016/j.biortech.2010.02.006, ISSN 0960-8524, pages 5144 - 5149, XP055346793 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biortech.2010.02.006 | by applicant | US2658310 | US3645040 | US3780471 | US4043903 | US4209388 | US4235043 | US4253271 | US4324067 | US4341038 | US4554390 | US5910254 | US6000551 | US6156561 | US6180376 | US6524486 |