|
30.01.2019 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
17.08.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.03.2013 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
98 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
102 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
100 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
98 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
91 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
20 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
41 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
29 |