EP2558527 - CLEAR GRAPHIC CLING FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEAVER, Laura Bauerle 114 Arrowhead Drive Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 02 /
MUNRO, Jeffrey C. 6315 West Mystic Meadow Houston, TX 77021 / US | 03 /
DANIEL, Sherrika D. 58 Terra Bella Manvel, TX 77578 / US | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/08] | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12727060.1 | 06.06.2012 | [2015/47] | WO2012US41021 | Priority number, date | US201161503105P | 30.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161503105 P | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013002976 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2558527 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2558527 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/04, C08L23/10 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
B29C43/003 (US);
B29C43/24 (US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
C08L23/08 (US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
C08J2323/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08L23/0815, C08L2205/025 (EP,US);
C08L23/14, C08L23/14, C08L2205/025 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/08] | C08L23/00, C08J5/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLARE GRAFISCHE HAFTFILME | [2013/08] | English: | CLEAR GRAPHIC CLING FILMS | [2013/08] | French: | FILMS GRAPHIQUES TRANSPARENTS AUTOCOLLANTS | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 03.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2012 | AL | 18.11.2015 | AT | 18.11.2015 | BE | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | DK | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | ES | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | HR | 18.11.2015 | IT | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | MK | 18.11.2015 | NL | 18.11.2015 | PL | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | RS | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | SM | 18.11.2015 | TR | 18.11.2015 | NO | 18.02.2016 | GR | 19.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | PT | 18.03.2016 | IE | 06.06.2016 | LU | 06.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 06.06.2012 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.06.2016 | ||
LU | 06.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.06.2012 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.06.2016 | ||
LU | 06.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 06.06.2012 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.06.2016 | ||
LU | 06.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 06.06.2012 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
IE | 06.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9839157 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [A] 1-9* the whole document * | by applicant | US3645992 | US5272236 | US5278272 | US5504172 | WO0001745 | US6525157 | US6960635 | WO2009067337 |