EP2689044 - HOT -ROLLED HIGH - STRENGTH STEEL STRUCTURAL MEMBERS AND METHOD OF FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSOLIDATED METAL PRODUCTS, INC. 1028 Depot Street Cincinnati, OH 45204 / US | [2014/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLAGHER, Hugh, M. 7262 State Road Cincinnati, OH 45203-2157 / US | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2019/40] |
Former [2014/05] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 12727187.2 | 16.05.2012 | [2019/40] | WO2012US38035 | Priority number, date | US201113243352 | 23.09.2011 Original published format: US201113243352 | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013043238 | Date: | 28.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2689044 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2689044 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C21D7/13, B21B1/088, B21B1/09, B21B1/092, B21B1/095, B21B1/098 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
C21D7/13 (EP,US);
B21B1/08 (US);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
C21D8/02 (EP,US);
C21D9/0068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUTEILE AUS HEISSGEWALZTEM HOCHFESTEM STAHL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2014/05] | English: | HOT -ROLLED HIGH - STRENGTH STEEL STRUCTURAL MEMBERS AND METHOD OF FABRICATION | [2014/05] | French: | ELÉMENTS STRUCTURAUX EN ACIER À RÉSISTANCE ÉLEVÉE LAMINÉS À CHAUD ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 14.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2012 | AL | 02.10.2019 | CY | 02.10.2019 | CZ | 02.10.2019 | EE | 02.10.2019 | FI | 02.10.2019 | HR | 02.10.2019 | LT | 02.10.2019 | LV | 02.10.2019 | MC | 02.10.2019 | MK | 02.10.2019 | MT | 02.10.2019 | PL | 02.10.2019 | RO | 02.10.2019 | RS | 02.10.2019 | SI | 02.10.2019 | SK | 02.10.2019 | SM | 02.10.2019 | BG | 02.01.2020 | NO | 02.01.2020 | GR | 03.01.2020 | IS | 02.02.2020 | PT | 03.02.2020 | IE | 16.05.2020 | LU | 16.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.05.2012 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
MT | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IE | 16.05.2020 | ||
LU | 16.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IE | 16.05.2020 | ||
LU | 16.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
LU | 16.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 02.10.2019 | |
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 02.10.2019 | |
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 02.10.2019 | |
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 02.10.2019 | |
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 02.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5100613 (BODNAR RICHARD L [US], et al) [A] 13-15* c. 1, l. 1-63 *; | [Y]EP0498733 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1-27 * Fig. 3, 4b with p. 1, l. 1f; p. 3, l. 14-21 with 40-44; p. 6, "Example 1"; p. 8, "Table 2"; Claims 1, 2 *; | [YD]US5704998 (GALLAGHER JR HUGH M [US]) [YD] 1-27 * c. 2, l. 11-38; c. 3, l. 10-43 * | Examination | US5100613 | EP0498733 | US5704998 | by applicant | US5704998 |