08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
13.03.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
05.04.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
29.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.12.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.06.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.03.2018 |
First examination report |
|
03.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2015 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
19.11.2014 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.10.2014 |
Change - representative |
|
15.10.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.08.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
16.05.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
31.03.2014 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
29.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
28.03.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
25.03.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2014 |
Deletion: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
22.03.2014 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
18.02.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
18.02.2014 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
08.02.2014 |
Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.02.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.01.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|