Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2724059 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2019 | B1 | EP2724059 | 30.04.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2012DE00286 | 16.03.2012 | DE102011076560 | 26.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012159595 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2013 | A3 | WO2012159595 | 29.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102011076560 | 26.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102011076560 | 29.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011076560 | 26.05.2011 |