EP2719119 - DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM USING POWER-OVER-ETHERNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place Southeast, Hickory North Carolina 28602 / US | [2015/16] |
Former [2014/16] | For all designated states Andrew LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNTER, Roger A., Jr. 146 Kimball Road Concord, Virginia 24538 / US | 02 /
MCALLISTER, Donald Robert 500 Meadowridge Drive Lynchburg, Virginia 24503 / US | 03 /
RANSON, Christopher G. 465 Carrie Lane Concord, Virginia 24538 / US | 04 /
KUMMETZ, Thomas Oberes Sandfeld 17 86477 Adelsried / DE | [2015/16] |
Former [2014/21] | 01 /
HUNTER, Roger A., Jr. 146 Kimball Road Concord, Virginia 24538 / US | ||
02 /
MCALLISTER, Donald Robert 500 Meadowridge Drive Lynchburg, Virginia 24503 / US | |||
03 /
RANSON, Christopher G. 465 Carrie Lane Concord, Virginia 24538 / US | |||
04 /
KUMMETZ, Thomas Hunnenring 6 86438 Kissing / DE | |||
Former [2014/16] | 01 /
HUNTER, Roger A., Jr. 146 Kimball Road Concord, Virginia 24538 / US | ||
02 /
MCALLISTER, Donald Robert 500 Meadowridge Drive Lynchburg, Virginia 24503 / US | |||
03 /
RANSON, Christopher G. 465 Carrie Lane Concord, Virginia 24538 / US | |||
04 /
KUMMETZ, Thomas 1903 Rocky Branch Drive Forest, Virginia 24551 / US | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Tanner, Andreas Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 12727758.0 | 08.06.2012 | WO2012US41576 | Priority number, date | US201161495067P | 09.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161495067 P | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012170834 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2719119 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2719119 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/10, H04L12/40 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
H04L12/40045 (EP,US);
G06F1/28 (US);
H04L12/10 (EP,US);
H04L41/0833 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTEILTES ANTENNENSYSTEM MIT POWER-OVER-ETHERNET | [2014/16] | English: | DISTRIBUTED ANTENNA SYSTEM USING POWER-OVER-ETHERNET | [2014/16] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANTENNE DISTRIBUÉ UTILISANT UNE ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE PAR CÂBLE ETHERNET | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 17.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15163657.8 / EP2942902 | EP17201521.6 / EP3301854 | EP19204469.1 / EP3678327 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2012 | AL | 03.06.2015 | AT | 03.06.2015 | BE | 03.06.2015 | CY | 03.06.2015 | CZ | 03.06.2015 | DK | 03.06.2015 | EE | 03.06.2015 | ES | 03.06.2015 | FI | 03.06.2015 | HR | 03.06.2015 | LT | 03.06.2015 | LV | 03.06.2015 | MC | 03.06.2015 | MK | 03.06.2015 | MT | 03.06.2015 | NL | 03.06.2015 | PL | 03.06.2015 | RO | 03.06.2015 | RS | 03.06.2015 | SE | 03.06.2015 | SI | 03.06.2015 | SK | 03.06.2015 | SM | 03.06.2015 | TR | 03.06.2015 | IE | 08.06.2015 | LU | 08.06.2015 | BG | 03.09.2015 | NO | 03.09.2015 | GR | 04.09.2015 | IS | 03.10.2015 | PT | 06.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.06.2012 | |
AT | 03.06.2015 | ||
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
MK | 03.06.2015 | ||
MT | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
SM | 03.06.2015 | ||
TR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
LU | 08.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 08.06.2012 | |
AT | 03.06.2015 | ||
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
MT | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
SM | 03.06.2015 | ||
TR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
LU | 08.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 08.06.2012 | |
AT | 03.06.2015 | ||
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
MT | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
SM | 03.06.2015 | ||
TR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
MT | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 08.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006164108 (HERBOLD JACOB [US]) [X] 1,13,16 * figure 3b * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0032] * [I] 2-12,14,15,17-20; | [A]US2007286599 (SAUER MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 2 ** paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] *; | [XI]US2008164890 (ADMON DAN [IL], et al) [X] 1,13,16 * figures 1a,2,6 * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0000] * [I] 2-12,14,15,17-20 |