EP2739967 - CHROMATOGRAPHY ELEMENT WITH LATERAL FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/24] | LATERALLY PERFUSED CHROMATOGRAPHY ELEMENT | ||
[2016/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTHACHER, Peter Sperlingweg 6 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2014/24] | Application number, filing date | 12727862.0 | 15.06.2012 | [2016/22] | WO2012EP61402 | Priority number, date | DE20111080527 | 05.08.2011 Original published format: DE102011080527 | [2014/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013020743 | Date: | 14.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2739967 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2739967 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/60, G01N30/56 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
G01N30/56 (EP,US);
G01N30/6095 (US);
G01N30/60 (EP,US);
G01N30/603 (EP,US);
G01N30/6091 (EP,US);
G01N30/96 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LATERAL DURCHSTRÖMTES CHROMATOGRAPHIEELEMENT | [2014/24] | English: | CHROMATOGRAPHY ELEMENT WITH LATERAL FLOW | [2016/02] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE AVEC CIRCULATION DE FLUIDE LATÉRALE | [2016/02] |
Former [2014/24] | LATERALLY PERFUSED CHROMATOGRAPHY ELEMENT | ||
Former [2014/24] | ÉLÉMENT DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE À CIRCULATION LATÉRALE | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 12.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2012 | AL | 01.06.2016 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | DK | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | ES | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | MK | 01.06.2016 | MT | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | RS | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | SM | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | IE | 15.06.2016 | LU | 15.06.2016 | BE | 30.06.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 15.06.2012 | |
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 15.06.2012 | |
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.06.2012 | |
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
LU | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.06.2012 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2003217923 (HARRISON D JED [CA], et al) [Y] 10,11 * figure 3A; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0066] , [0158] * [A] 6-9; | [A]US2009255601 (BAEUERLE MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0027]; figures 4,10 *; | [A]DE102009052234 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0024]; figure 1; claim 9 *; | [XAYI] - QING HE ET AL, "Ion liquid chromatography on-a-chip with beads-packed parylene column", MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, 2004. 17TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFER ENCE ON. (MEMS) MAASTRICHT, NETHERLANDS 25-29 JAN. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20040125), doi:10.1109/MEMS.2004.1290560, ISBN 978-0-7803-8265-7, pages 212 - 215, XP010767863 [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 212, column R; figure 2 * * figure 3 * * figure 8 * [A] 6-9 [Y] 10,11 [I] 3,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEMS.2004.1290560 |