Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2723562 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280030862 CN201480039262 CN201810083266 CN201811031882 EP12728012 EP14742702 EP18150842 JP2014517011 JP2016525400 JP2020078997

More

JP2021202346 JP2022097110 KR20147001946 KR20167003191 US201113247182 US2012041811W US201313937707 US2014045554W US201615207993 US201816002194 US202117401980 US202318202134



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2015006201Global Dossier 15.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201313937707 09.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2018281355Global Dossier 04.10.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201816002194 07.06.2018
US201313937707 09.07.2013
US201615207993 12.07.2016
US201161500766 24.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9616641Global Dossier 11.04.2017B2
US2013295357 07.11.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201313937707 09.07.2013
US201161500766 24.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12059870Global Dossier 13.08.2024B2
US2023294383 21.09.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201816002194 07.06.2018
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201313937707 09.07.2013
US202318202134 25.05.2023
US201615207993 12.07.2016
US202117401980 13.08.2021
US201161500766 24.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11691390Global Dossier 04.07.2023B2
US2021370647 02.12.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201816002194 07.06.2018
US201313937707 09.07.2013
US201615207993 12.07.2016
US202117401980 13.08.2021
US201161500766 24.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10035332Global Dossier 31.07.2018B2
US2016318284 03.11.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201313937707 09.07.2013
US201615207993 12.07.2016
US201161500766 24.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20160030253Global Dossier 16.03.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US45554 07.07.2014
US201313937707 09.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102048463BGlobal Dossier 25.11.2019B1
KR20140048944 24.04.2014A
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201161500766 24.06.2011
WO2012US41811 11.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2022120162Global Dossier 17.08.2022A
Priority number Date
US201313937707 09.07.2013
JP2020078997 28.04.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2022046543Global Dossier 23.03.2022A
Priority number Date
US201313937707 09.07.2013
JP2020078997 28.04.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2020128331Global Dossier 27.08.2020A
Priority number Date
US201313937707 09.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2016530190Global Dossier 29.09.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US45554 07.07.2014
US201313937707 09.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5890518BGlobal Dossier 22.03.2016B2
JP2014523389 11.09.2014A
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201161500766 24.06.2011
WO2012US41811 11.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3323611Global Dossier 23.05.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
EP12728012 11.06.2012
US201161500766 24.06.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3046761Global Dossier 27.07.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014US45554 07.07.2014
US201313937707 09.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109016739BGlobal Dossier 04.01.2022B
CN109016739 18.12.2018A
Priority number Date
US201313937707 09.07.2013
CN201480039262 07.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108127998Global Dossier 08.06.2018A
Priority number Date
US201313937707 09.07.2013
CN201480039262 07.07.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105377551BGlobal Dossier 08.03.2019B
CN105377551 02.03.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014US45554 07.07.2014
US201313937707 09.07.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103619582BGlobal Dossier 09.12.2015B
CN103619582 05.03.2014A
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201161500766 24.06.2011
WO2012US41811 11.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2723562Global Dossier 07.02.2018B1
EP2723562 30.04.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201161500766 24.06.2011
WO2012US41811 11.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI649286B 01.02.2019B
TW201509852 16.03.2015A
Priority number Date
US201313937707 09.07.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012177426Global Dossier 27.12.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201161500766 24.06.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10035331Global Dossier 31.07.2018B2
US2012328843 27.12.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201161500766 24.06.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202012013654U 03.01.2019U1
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201161500766 24.06.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202012013655U 03.01.2019U1
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201161500766 24.06.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI581960B 11.05.2017B
TW201302457 16.01.2013A
Priority number Date
US201113247182 28.09.2011
US201161500766 24.06.2011
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3323611