EP2726350 - MAGNETIC VALVE AND MAGNETIC VALVE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEER, Harald Graf-Adelmann-Str. 31 71691 Freiberg / DE | [2014/19] | Application number, filing date | 12728204.4 | 12.06.2012 | WO2012EP61064 | Priority number, date | DE20111078502 | 01.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011078502 | DE201210209729 | 11.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012209729 | [2014/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013004454 | Date: | 10.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2726350 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/36, F16K31/06 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
B60T8/363 (EP);
F16K31/06 (KR);
B60T8/36 (KR);
F16K31/0655 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/19] | Title | German: | MAGNETVENTIL UND MAGNETVENTILANORDNUNG | [2014/19] | English: | MAGNETIC VALVE AND MAGNETIC VALVE ARRANGEMENT | [2014/19] | French: | ÉLECTROVANNE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROVANNE | [2014/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 26.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/08] | 26.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE2052307 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED); | [XA]WO9617756 (ITT [US]); | [X]WO0024620 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al); | [XAI]DE102004009461 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]DE102005037964 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]); | [XA]DE102005042888 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]); | [XA]EP2246601 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE102006055831 |