EP2721162 - ABE FERMENTATION PROCESS INVOLVING PRODUCT ABSORPTION BY ISOPHORONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/17] | ABE FERMENTATION METHOD COMPRISING PRODUCT ABSORPTION THROUGH ISOPHORON | ||
[2018/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2018/32] |
Former [2014/17] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NITZ, Jörg-Joachim Phönixberg 1d 45257 Essen / DE | 02 /
GRUND, Gerda Forellenweg 3 48653 Coesfeld / DE | 03 /
BECKER, Franz Ulrich Am Berg 16 63579 Freigericht-Horbach / DE | 04 /
STIER, Patrick Pfaffenberg 23 63762 Großostheim / DE | [2014/17] | Application number, filing date | 12728212.7 | 13.06.2012 | [2018/32] | WO2012EP61141 | Priority number, date | DE20111077705 | 17.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011077705 | [2014/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012171929 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2721162 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2721162 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/06, C12P7/16, C12P7/28 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
C12P7/065 (EP,US);
C12P7/06 (US);
B01D53/1487 (EP,US);
B01D53/1493 (EP,US);
C07C45/783 (EP,US);
C07C45/80 (EP,US);
C07C45/82 (EP,US);
C12P7/16 (EP,US);
C12P7/28 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/783, C07C49/08 (US,EP);
C07C45/80, C07C49/08 (EP,US);
C07C45/82, C07C49/08 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABE FERMENTATIONSVERFAHREN UMFASSEND DIE PRODUKTABSORPTION DURCH ISOPHORON | [2014/17] | English: | ABE FERMENTATION PROCESS INVOLVING PRODUCT ABSORPTION BY ISOPHORONE | [2018/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FERMENTATION ABE COMPRENANT L'ABSORPTION DU PRODUIT PAR ISOPHORONE | [2018/15] |
Former [2014/17] | ABE FERMENTATION METHOD COMPRISING PRODUCT ABSORPTION THROUGH ISOPHORON | ||
Former [2014/17] | PROCÉDÉ DE FERMENTATION ABE COMPRENANT L'ABSORPTION DE PRODUIT AU MOYEN D'ISOPHORONE | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 15.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.06.2012 | AL | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | MT | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | RS | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | PT | 08.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 13.06.2012 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
MT | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.06.2012 | |
AL | 08.08.2018 | ||
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [IA]WO2009079362 (DU PONT [US], et al) [I] 1,3,4,8-12 * page 3, line 11 - page 5, line 4 * * page 9, line 8 - line 15 * * page 15 - page 16; claims 1-13 * [A] 2,5-7; | [A]US2009162912 (EZEJI THADDEUS C [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 1, paragraph 6 - paragraph 9 * * page 2, paragraph 16 - paragraph 20 * * page 8; claims 1-7 *; | [A] - COLOMBO, A. ET AL., "Liquid-Liquid Equilibria of the Ternary Systems Water + Acetic acid + Ethyl Acetate and Water + Acetic Acid + Isophorone (3,5,5-Trimethyl-2-cyclohexen-1-one)", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING DATA, (1999), vol. 44, pages 35 - 39, XP002685675 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JE9702910 |