EP2723673 - BIT AND SYSTEM FOR SENDING A VISCOUS AND/OR LIQUID SUBSTANCE INTO AN ANIMAL'S MOUTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/18] | BIT AND SYSTEM FOR FEEDING A VISCOUS AND/OR LIQUID SUBSTANCE INTO THE MOUTH OF AN ANIMAL | ||
[2019/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hall, Heidi chemin des Coûtes 30 1468 Cheyres / CH | [2014/28] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Hall, Heidi Route de Béthanie 74 1474 Châbles / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2020/04] |
Former [2014/18] | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 12728620.1 | 22.06.2012 | [2020/04] | WO2012EP62146 | Priority number, date | CH20110001072 | 24.06.2011 Original published format: CH 10722011 | [2014/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012175710 | Date: | 27.12.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2723673 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2723673 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B68B1/06, A61D7/00 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
A01K13/003 (EP,US);
A61D7/00 (EP,US);
B68B1/06 (EP,US);
B68B2001/044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEBISS UND SYSTEM ZUR ZUFÜHRUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT UND/ODER EINER VISKOSEN MASSE IN EIN TIERMAUL | [2019/29] | English: | BIT AND SYSTEM FOR SENDING A VISCOUS AND/OR LIQUID SUBSTANCE INTO AN ANIMAL'S MOUTH | [2019/29] | French: | MORS ET SYSTÈME POUR ENVOYER UNE SUBSTANCE VISQUEUSE ET/OU LIQUIDE DANS LA BOUCHE D'UN ANIMAL | [2014/18] |
Former [2014/18] | MUNDSTÜCK UND SYSTEM FÜR DIE ZUFUHR EINER PASTÖSEN UND/ODER FLÜSSIGEN SUBSTANZ IN DIE MUNDHÖHLE EINES TIERES | ||
Former [2014/18] | BIT AND SYSTEM FOR FEEDING A VISCOUS AND/OR LIQUID SUBSTANCE INTO THE MOUTH OF AN ANIMAL | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 16.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2019 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2012 | AL | 22.01.2020 | AT | 22.01.2020 | CY | 22.01.2020 | CZ | 22.01.2020 | DK | 22.01.2020 | EE | 22.01.2020 | ES | 22.01.2020 | FI | 22.01.2020 | HR | 22.01.2020 | IT | 22.01.2020 | LT | 22.01.2020 | LV | 22.01.2020 | MK | 22.01.2020 | MT | 22.01.2020 | PL | 22.01.2020 | RO | 22.01.2020 | RS | 22.01.2020 | SE | 22.01.2020 | SI | 22.01.2020 | SK | 22.01.2020 | SM | 22.01.2020 | TR | 22.01.2020 | BG | 22.04.2020 | NO | 22.04.2020 | GR | 23.04.2020 | IS | 22.05.2020 | PT | 14.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 22.06.2012 | |
AL | 22.01.2020 | ||
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.06.2012 | |
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NO | 22.04.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]GB2286324 (LISTER PETER [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,14,15 * page 2, lines 26-28 * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 3 * * page 5, line 5 - page 34 * * page 6, lines 18-25 * * claims 1,2,5 * * figure 1 * [A] 10-13,16-21 [I] 3-5,8,22,23; | [A]DE19500520 (JELTSCH ALMUT DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4535724 (DAVID CONSTANT V [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, lines 4-28 *; | [A]WO9826652 (ROBART GLENICE [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2863162 (VYGON [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | CH705153 | GB2286324 | FR2863162 | GB2473540 | DE19500520 | DE2404007 | US5566645 | WO2005117745 | GB135448 | WO9826652 | US2001032444 | DE9400402U | US4040422 | FR2752417 | US5557905 | WO9206651 | GB190704027 | US4535724 | WO2010105309 | WO2011106802 | WO2012013782 | WO2005099617 | WO2012155193 | US2007074672 | US2010125097 | US2012272913 | US2012174872 | EP2335771 | WO2012066177 | WO2011125073 | WO2012016328 | WO2009099869 | EP2471488 | EP2514477 | US2008306095 | WO2012111539 | WO2012149099 | WO2011029208 | WO2012054611 | WO2011052073 | WO2012114340 | WO2012112355 | WO2012054085 | WO2012098335 | US2011092922 | US2012265159 | WO2012151553 | WO2012176029 | WO2011103065 | WO2012034167 | WO2012096657 | WO2012111015 | WO2012013429 | US2012210630 | EP2452638 | WO2008143529 | US2012272902 | WO2012151583 | WO0209797 | WO2011086175 | WO2008024814 | WO2005081922 | WO9846293 | US5128518 | WO2018112287 | CN104840362 | WO2018048745 | WO2017187405 | by applicant | FR2752417 | GB190704027 | DE2404007 | WO2010105309 | WO2005117745 | US2001032444 | WO9206651 | US5557905 | US4040422 | DE9400402U | US5566645 | GB135448 | US2011061349 | EP1689343 |