EP2713830 - DETACHED AND MOBILE PRODUCT ADVERTISEMENT STAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Turhal, Salih Ziya Gokalp Cad. 3/22 Kizilay Ankara / TR | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Peter, Julian Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Sonnenstrasse 19 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12728854.6 | 22.05.2012 | WO2012TR00090 | Priority number, date | TR20110002696 | 27.05.2011 Original published format: TR 201102696 | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012166069 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2713830 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47F11/04 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
A47F11/04 (EP,US);
G09F11/02 (US);
G09F13/005 (US);
G09F13/165 (US);
G09F21/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Title | German: | FREISTEHENDER UND MOBILER PRODUKTWERBESTÄNDER | [2014/15] | English: | DETACHED AND MOBILE PRODUCT ADVERTISEMENT STAND | [2014/15] | French: | STAND PUBLICITAIRE ISOLÉ ET MOBILE POUR DES PRODUITS | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 21.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/35] | Public notification(s) | Noting of loss of rights pursuant to Rule 112(1) EPC (EPO Form 2524 dated 08.02.2017) | Turhal, Salih Ziya Gokalp Cad. 3/22 Kizilay Ankara / TR | [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007251903 (HIGH JEFFREY L [US]) [X] 1* the whole document * |