EP2721127 - LUBRICATING COMPOSITION CONTAINING A SALT OF A CARBOXYLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, OH 44092-2298 / US | [2014/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOSIER, Patrick E. 29400 Lakeland Blvd. Wickliffe, OH 44092-2298 / US | 02 /
CAPITOSTI, Scott 29400 Lakeland Blvd. Wickliffe, OH 44092-2298 / US | 03 /
DELBRIDGE, Ewan E. 29400 Lakeland Blvd. Wickliffe, OH 44092-2298 / US | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12728931.2 | 14.06.2012 | WO2012US42361 | Priority number, date | US201161497146P | 15.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161497146 P | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012174184 | Date: | 20.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2721127 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C10M129/44, C10M129/54, C10M133/06, C10N30/06, C10N30/10, C10N40/25 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
C10M129/54 (EP,CN,US);
C10M129/44 (EP,CN,US);
C10M133/06 (EP,CN,US);
C10M149/14 (CN,US);
C10M161/00 (CN);
C10M2201/08 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2207/128 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2207/144 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2215/02 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2215/224 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,CN,US);
C10M2217/04 (CN,US);
C10M2223/045 (CN,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,CN,US);
C10N2030/10 (EP,CN,US);
C10N2030/42 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2223/045, C10N2010/04 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Title | German: | SCHMIERMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM SALZ EINER CARBONSÄURE | [2014/17] | English: | LUBRICATING COMPOSITION CONTAINING A SALT OF A CARBOXYLIC ACID | [2014/17] | French: | COMPOSITION LUBRIFIANTE CONTENANT UN SEL D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE | [2014/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 17.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/27] | 02.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3840462 (GERETSCHLAGER M) [X] 1-3,7,9-12,18 * column 3, lines 2-5 * * Table *; column 3 *; | [X]US5667539 (JACKSON GRAHAM [GB], et al) [X] 1,17 * column 1, lines 6-9 * * column 6, lines 41-57 * * column 23 - column 24; example 6; table 6 *; | [A]BE425425 (N.V. DE BATAAFSCHE PETROLEUM MAATSCHAPPIJ) [A] 1-3 * example - * | Examination | WO2010098337 | US2011306429 | - Christopher Ruger ET AL, "Ability of Some Antioxidants to Stabilize Soybean Oil in Industrial Use Conditions", Journal of the American Oil Chemists' Society 79 (7), (20020101), pages 733 - 736, URL: https://link.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1007/s11746-002-0550-2.pdf, (20190115), XP055541899 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11746-002-0550-2 | - JIE FU ET AL, "Synthesis and Antibacterial Activities Evaluation of Water-Soluble Caffeic Acid Ammonium Salts", vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 0975-6299, (20100401), pages 1 - 13, INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMA AND BIO SCIENCES, P. MUTHUPRASANNA PUB. & ED, IN, URL: https://ijpbs.net/archive-issue.php?issueid=11, XP009521664 | by applicant | US3790478 | GB1358046 | GB1180389 | GB1180386 | GB1162818 | FR2063994 | FR1537892 | US3336349 | US7423000 | US7582126 | US5576274 | US2795548 | US5102569 | US2006019840 | US3962104 | US4253980 | US3778371 | US4171959 | US4326973 | US4338206 | US5254138 | WO2008147704 | US3172892 | US3219666 | US3316177 | US3340281 | US3351552 | US3381022 | US3433744 | US3444170 | US3467668 | US3501405 | US3542680 | US3576743 | US3632511 | US4234435 | USRE26433E | US6165235 | US7238650 | EP0355895 | WO2006015130 | US4863623 | US6107257 | US6107258 | US6117825 | US6429178 | US6429179 | US6153565 | US6281179 | US2005065045 | US7407919 | US6559105 | US5038319 | WO2006047486 |