EP2714440 - SERVICING DEVICE FOR VEHICLE AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEMS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAID DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dometic Sweden AB Torggatan 8 171 54 Solna / SE | [2018/18] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states Dometic Sweden AB Torggatan 8 171 54 Solna / SE | ||
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states Dometic WAECO International GmbH Industriegebiet Süd Hollefeldstrasse 63 48282 Emsdetten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESCH, Franz-Josef Schulkampf 66 48477 Hörstel / DE | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [2018/18] |
Former [2014/15] | GROSSE SCHUMACHER KNAUER VON HIRSCHHAUSEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12728962.7 | 23.05.2012 | [2018/18] | WO2012EP02197 | Priority number, date | DE201120101256U | 23.05.2011 Original published format: DE 202011101256 U | [2014/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012159749 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2714440 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2714440 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, F25B45/00 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
B60H1/00585 (EP,US);
F25B43/02 (US);
F25B45/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SERVICEGERÄT FÜR FAHRZEUGKLIMAANLAGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINEM BETREIBEN | [2014/15] | English: | SERVICING DEVICE FOR VEHICLE AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEMS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAID DEVICE | [2014/15] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENTRETIEN POUR SYSTÈMES DE CLIMATISATION DE VÉHICULE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 11.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2012 | AL | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | FI | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | MT | 02.05.2018 | PT | 02.05.2018 | RO | 02.05.2018 | RS | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | TR | 02.05.2018 | IE | 23.05.2018 | LU | 23.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | NO | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 23.05.2012 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MK | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 23.05.2018 | ||
LU | 23.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 23.05.2012 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 23.05.2018 | ||
LU | 23.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 23.05.2018 | ||
LU | 23.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 23.05.2018 | ||
LU | 23.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 23.05.2018 | ||
LU | 23.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 23.05.2018 | ||
LU | 23.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
IE | 23.05.2018 | ||
LU | 23.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
LU | 23.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5024061 (PFEIL JR RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * [A] 4; | [XA]US5371019 (MANZ KENNETH W [US], et al) [X] 4-6 * column 4, line 61 - line 65; figure 3 * [A] 1; | [A]US6408637 (HANSON ARNOLD M [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 *; | [AD]WO2007085480 (WAECO INTERNAT GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1,4* abstract * | by applicant | WO2007085480 | US2009158756 | DE202008003123U | DE20091054446 |