EP2718910 - IN-LINE DECAY-TIME SCANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICPA HOLDING SA Avenue de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASIC, Milan Rue de l'ancien-port 8 CH-1201 Genève / CH | 02 /
DUCA, Nicola Chemin Des Semilles 25 D CH-1870 Monthey / CH | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/47] |
Former [2014/16] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12729859.4 | 01.06.2012 | [2015/47] | WO2012EP02339 | Priority number, date | US201161493710P | 06.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161493710 P | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012167894 | Date: | 13.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2718910 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2718910 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/12, G01N21/64 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
G01N21/6408 (EP,US);
G01N21/64 (KR);
G01J1/58 (US);
G07D7/12 (KR);
G07D7/1205 (EP,US);
G01N2201/062 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INLINE-ZERFALLSZEITSCANNER | [2014/16] | English: | IN-LINE DECAY-TIME SCANNER | [2014/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BALAYAGE DE TEMPS D'AFFAIBLISSEMENT EN LIGNE | [2014/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 22.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2012 | AL | 18.11.2015 | AT | 18.11.2015 | BE | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | DK | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | ES | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | HR | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | MK | 18.11.2015 | NL | 18.11.2015 | PL | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | RS | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | SM | 18.11.2015 | NO | 18.02.2016 | GR | 19.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | PT | 18.03.2016 | IE | 01.06.2016 | LU | 01.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 01.06.2012 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
IE | 01.06.2016 | ||
LU | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.06.2012 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
IE | 01.06.2016 | ||
LU | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 01.06.2012 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
IE | 01.06.2016 | ||
LU | 01.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.06.2012 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
IE | 01.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
IE | 01.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2002131618 (AHLERS BENEDIKT [DE], et al) [I] 1-11,13-25 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0054] * * figures 1-6 *; | [I]US2011121203 (RAPOPORT WILLIAM ROSS [US], et al) [I] 1,21,25 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5351268 (JENSEN EARL M [US], et al) [A] 1,21,25 * column 7, line 20 - column 8, line 22 * * column 9, line 52 - column 11, line 31 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2007189595 (GIERING THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1,21,25 * column 10 * * column 18 - column 25 * * figures 1-3,5 * | by applicant | EP0066854 | US4451530 | US4452843 | US4451521 | US4598205 | US4533244 | US3473027 | US3663813 | US6996252 | US7213757 | US7427030 | US6264107 | US7262420 |