EP2715306 - MULTIPLE RADIATION INSPECTION OF OPHTHALMIC LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SITES, Peter, W. 1571 Country Walk Drive Orang Park, FL 32003 / US | 02 /
EDWARDS, Russell, J. 4535 Blueberry Woods Circle Jacksonville, FL 32258 / US | 03 /
CAGLE, Kenneth, L. 119 Riverbend Drive Saint Marys GA 31558 / US | 04 /
DUBIN, Matthew, B. 3721 North Sabino Point Place Tucson, AZ 85750 / US | [2014/15] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/15] | Application number, filing date | 12730078.8 | 30.05.2012 | WO2012US39995 | Priority number, date | US201161492932P | 03.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161492932 P | [2014/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012166797 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2715306 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2715306 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/02, G01N21/88 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
G01M11/0257 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/8806 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2021/8845 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2021/9583 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSPEKTION MIT MEHRERE STRAHLUNGEN VON OPHTHALMISCHE LINSEN | [2014/48] | English: | MULTIPLE RADIATION INSPECTION OF OPHTHALMIC LENSES | [2014/15] | French: | INSPECTION DE LENTILLES OPHTALMIQUES AVEC PLUSIEURS SOURCES DE RADIATION | [2014/48] |
Former [2014/15] | MULTIPLE STRAHLUNGSINSPEKTION VON OPHTHALMISCHEN LINSEN | ||
Former [2014/15] | INSPECTION DE LENTILLES OPHTALMIQUES PAR RAYONNEMENT MULTIPLE | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 01.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 15.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 15.05.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2012 | AL | 01.07.2015 | AT | 01.07.2015 | BE | 01.07.2015 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | DK | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | ES | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | HR | 01.07.2015 | LT | 01.07.2015 | LV | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | MK | 01.07.2015 | NL | 01.07.2015 | PL | 01.07.2015 | RO | 01.07.2015 | RS | 01.07.2015 | SE | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | SM | 01.07.2015 | TR | 01.07.2015 | NO | 01.10.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | IS | 01.11.2015 | PT | 02.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 30.05.2012 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
BG | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.05.2012 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.05.2012 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.05.2012 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 01.07.2015 | |
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 01.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO03073061 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 3 * * page 4, lines 16-22 * * page 5, lines 10-14 * * page 9, lines 1-29 * * page 12, lines 8-10 *; | [I]US5719668 (OANA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * column 8, lines 5-29 * * column 9, lines 20-24 * * column 12, lines 4-15 * | by applicant | US6882411 | US6577387 | US6246062 | US6154274 | US5995213 | US5943436 | US5828446 | US5812254 | US5805276 | US5748300 | US5745230 | US5687541 | US5675962 | US5649410 | US5640464 | US5578331 | US5568715 | US5443152 | US5528357 | US5500732 |