EP2724156 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER AND AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Jackson Laboratory 600 Main Street Bar Harbor, ME 04609 / US | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLS, Kevin David 41 Meadow Drive Bar Harbor Maine 04609 / US | 02 /
HASHAM, Muneer Gulamhusien 106 Gary Moore Road Ellsworth Maine 04605 / US | 03 /
MCPHEE, Caroline Gardner 13 Hodgdon Road Seal Cove Maine 04674 / US | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Kehoe, Laura Ellen, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2017/33] |
Former [2014/18] | Kehoe, Laura Ellen, et al Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 12730343.6 | 19.06.2012 | [2017/33] | WO2012US43074 | Priority number, date | US201161501522P | 27.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161501522 P | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013003112 | Date: | 03.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2724156 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2724156 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/145, G01N33/50, C07C309/51, C07C311/08, C07C311/14, C07C335/20, C12Q1/68 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
G01N33/5008 (EP,CN,US);
C07C331/30 (US);
A61K31/145 (EP,US);
A61K31/166 (CN);
A61K31/18 (CN);
A61K31/185 (CN);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07C307/10 (US);
C07C309/51 (EP,CN,US);
C07C311/08 (EP,CN,US);
C07C311/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07C335/20 (EP,CN,US);
C07C381/00 (CN);
C07C2601/02 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | G01N33/50, A61K31/00, A61K31/255, A61K31/26, A61P35/00, A61P35/02, A61P37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS UND AUTOIMMUNERKRANKUNGEN | [2014/18] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER AND AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE | [2014/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER ET D'UNE MALADIE AUTO-IMMUNE | [2014/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 21.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2016 | Decision despatched | 21.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.12.2014 | Decision despatched | 21.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.12.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2012 | AL | 16.08.2017 | AT | 16.08.2017 | CY | 16.08.2017 | CZ | 16.08.2017 | DK | 16.08.2017 | EE | 16.08.2017 | ES | 16.08.2017 | FI | 16.08.2017 | HR | 16.08.2017 | IT | 16.08.2017 | LT | 16.08.2017 | LV | 16.08.2017 | MC | 16.08.2017 | MK | 16.08.2017 | NL | 16.08.2017 | PL | 16.08.2017 | PT | 16.08.2017 | RO | 16.08.2017 | RS | 16.08.2017 | SE | 16.08.2017 | SI | 16.08.2017 | SK | 16.08.2017 | SM | 16.08.2017 | TR | 16.08.2017 | BG | 16.11.2017 | NO | 16.11.2017 | GR | 17.11.2017 | IS | 16.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.06.2012 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CY | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
HR | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
MK | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.06.2012 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
HR | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 19.06.2012 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
TR | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
IT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
SM | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
DK | 16.08.2017 | ||
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
LV | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
ES | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
PL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
RS | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
NL | 16.08.2017 | ||
NO | 16.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 16.08.2017 | |
NO | 16.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03039557 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-27,32-44,73-99,104-115 * figures 1-9; claims 1-6,16-31 *; | [A]WO2004021987 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-27,32-44,73-99,104-115 * claims 1,3,5 *; | [XD] - T. ISHIDA ET AL, "DIDS, a chemical compound that inhibits RAD51-mediated homologous pairing and strand exchange", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20090330), vol. 37, no. 10, doi:10.1093/nar/gkp200, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 3367 - 3376, XP055036178 [XD] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * Relevant for non unity * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkp200 | [XI] - MUNEER G HASHAM ET AL, "Widespread genomic breaks generated by activation-induced cytidine deaminase are prevented by homologous recombination", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, (20100725), vol. 11, no. 9, doi:10.1038/ni.1909, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 820 - 826, XP055036263 [X] 1-9,21,22,34-40,44,73-81,93,94,106-112 * abstract * * page 821, column 1, line 16, paragraph 1 - line 21 * * page 821, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * [I] 10-22,32,33,41-43,82-94,104,105,113-115 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni.1909 | [A] - HAITAO LI ET AL, "2,3',4,4',5'-Pentamethoxy-trans-stilbene, a resveratrol derivative, inhibits colitis-associated colorectal carcinogenesis in mice", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (20100701), vol. 160, no. 6, doi:10.1111/j.1476-5381.2010.00785.x, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 1352 - 1361, XP055036726 [A] 1-27,32-44,73-99,104-115 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1476-5381.2010.00785.x | [A] - KIM Y H ET AL, "Piceatannol, a stilbene present in grapes, attenuates dextran sulfate sodium-induced colitis", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 8, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.INTIMP.2008.08.003, ISSN 1567-5769, (20081210), pages 1695 - 1702, (20080904), XP025473993 [A] 1-27,32-44,73-99,104-115 * abstract * * figure 1a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.intimp.2008.08.003 | [A] - BADGER A M ET AL, "Idoxifene, a novel selective estrogen receptor modulator, is effective in a rat model of adjuvant-induced arthritis", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, US, (19991201), vol. 291, no. 3, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 1380 - 1386, XP002372594 [A] 1-27,32-44,73-99,104-115 * abstract * * figure 1 * | [A] - JIN-MING HWANG ET AL, "Reduction of anion exchanger 2 expression induces apoptosis of human hepatocellular carcinoma cells", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20090218), vol. 327, no. 1-2, ISSN 1573-4919, pages 135 - 144, XP019684248 [A] 1-27,32-44,73-99,104-115 * abstract * | [A] - CHUNG-JUNG LIU ET AL, "Anion exchanger inhibitor DIDS induces human poorly-differentiated malignant hepatocellular carcinoma HA22T cell apoptosis", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20071016), vol. 308, no. 1-2, ISSN 1573-4919, pages 117 - 125, XP019578300 [A] 1-27,32-44,73-99,104-115 * abstract * | [A] - HORVAT B ET AL, "Tumour cell proliferation is abolished by inhibitors of Na<+>H<+> and HCO3<->Cl<-> exchange", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 29, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0959-8049(93)90591-3, ISSN 0959-8049, (19930101), pages 132 - 137, (19930101), XP026201861 [A] 1-27,32-44,73-99,104-115 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0959-8049(93)90591-3 | [A] - MONA LEUENBERGER ET AL, "AID protein expression in chronic lymphocytic leukemia/small lymphocytic lymphoma is associated with poor prognosis and complex genetic alterations", MODERN PATHOLOGY, (20100201), vol. 23, no. 2, doi:10.1038/modpathol.2009.156, ISSN 0893-3952, pages 177 - 186, XP055036781 [A] 1-27,32-44,73-99,104-115 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/modpathol.2009.156 | by applicant | US548257 | US3387050 | US3773919 | US4326055 | US4366241 | US4376110 | US4426330 | US4517288 | US4534899 | US4723034 | US4723028 | WO8804300 | WO8804924 | US4837168 | US4837028 | US4892949 | WO9004384 | WO9011364 | US4965343 | US4996237 | WO9105545 | US5013556 | US5045694 | EP0454461 | WO9117271 | US5068300 | WO9201047 | WO9202532 | US5093246 | US5118937 | US5213804 | US5225212 | WO9322461 | US5264221 | EP0445131 | US5322770 | WO9420073 | US5356633 | EP0496813 | US5430062 | JPH07225558 | EP0684315 | WO9610391 | US5525632 | US5540935 | US5543152 | US5556948 | US5561122 | US5563298 | WO9631622 | JPH08301831 | US5583973 | WO9640062 | US5589506 | WO9700478 | US5612894 | WO9710365 | WO9713499 | US5665710 | US5670356 | US5719060 | US5731353 | JPH1081673 | EP0834575 | EP0834576 | WO9830883 | US5837832 | US5849954 | WO9859361 | US6022998 | US6043082 | US6146885 | US6177220 | US6191105 | US6218108 | US6268490 | US6316198 | US6329209 | WO0214860 | US6365418 | US6379897 | US6451536 | US2002137698 | US2002155493 | WO02086096 | US2003013208 | US2003017515 | US2003027780 | US2003077616 | US6562834 | US2003129665 | US2003134304 | US2003157485 | WO03070726 | US6618679 | US2003199001 | US6649595 | US2003215858 | US6664377 | US6670461 | US2004014959 | US6747014 | US2004143023 | US2004147788 | US6794499 | WO2005016919 | US6887906 | US6913880 | US6977295 | US6998484 | US7053195 | US7063860 | US7070802 | US7157099 | WO2007026157 | US2007213292 | US2007276172 | US7319933 | US7321050 | US2008071364 | EP1946757 | WO2009036297 | US7655696 | WO2010019898 | US7714161 | US7781580 | US7820848 | US8101804 | - ISHIDA, T. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2009), vol. 37, no. 10, pages 3367 - 76 | - LALLY ET AL., CANCER RES, (2007), vol. 67, page 8791 | - VOLPI; BRIDGER, BIOTECHNIQUES, vol. 45, no. 4, pages 385 - 409 | - RAKIMAN ET AL., ADVANCE BIOTECH, (2008), pages 39 - 42 | - The Merck Manual of Diagnosis and Therapy, 18th Edition,, MERCK RESEARCH LABORATORIES, (2006), ISBN 0-911910-18-2 | - ROBERT S. PORTER ET AL., The Encyclopedia of Molecular Biology, BLACKWELL SCIENCE LTD., (1994), ISBN 0-632-02182-9 | - Molecular Biology and Biotechnology: a Comprehensive Desk Reference, VCH PUBLISHERS, INC., (1995), ISBN 1-56081-569-8 | - BENJAMIN LEWIN, Genes IX, JONES & BARTLETT PUBLISHING, (2007), ISBN 9780763740634 | - "Methods in Enzymology", J. N. ABELSON, M. I. SIMON, G. B. FIELDS, Solid-Phase Peptide Synthesis, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1997), vol. 289, ISBN 9780121821906 | - S. L. BERGER AND A. R. KIMMEL, Methods in Enzymology: Guide to Molecular Cloning Techniques, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., (1987), vol. 152 | - JOHN E. COLIGAN, ET. AL., E, Current Protocols in Protein Science, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC. | - JUAN S. BONIFACINO ET. AL., Current Protocols in Cell Biology (CPCB, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC. | - JENNIE P. MATHER AND DAVID BARNES, Animal Cell Culture Methods (Methods in Cell Biology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1998), vol. 57 | - LANZAVECCHIA ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 17, page 105 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HARMSEN ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 77, no. 1, pages 13 - 22 | - HOLT ET AL., TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 21, no. 11, pages 484 - 490 | - HUNKAPILLER; HOOD, NATURE, (1986), vol. 323, pages 15 - 16 | - BINZ ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2005), pages 1257 - 6 | - LEE ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2010), vol. 107, no. 21, pages 9567 - 71 | - GEBAUER; SKERRA, CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL., (2009), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 245 - 255 | - BATZER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 5081 | - OHTSUKA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, pages 2605 - 2608 | - ROSSOLINI ET AL., MOL. CELL. PROBES, (1994), vol. 8, pages 91 - 98 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PRINTING COMPANY, (1990), pages 1289 - 1329 | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - MANIS ET AL., TRENDS IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 23, pages 31 - 39 | - CHAUDHURI; ALT, NAT REV IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 4, pages 541 - 552 | - LONGERICH ET AL., CURR OPIN IMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 18, pages 164 - 174 | - CHAUDHURI ET AL., ADV IMMUNOL, (2007), vol. 94, pages 157 - 214 | - CROUCH ET AL., J EXP MED, (2007), vol. 204, pages 1145 - 1156 | - MURAMATSU ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1999), vol. 274, pages 18470 - 6 | - LONGERICH ET AL., CURR OPIN IMMUNOL, (2006), vol. 18, pages 164 - 176 | - MILLS ET AL., IMMUNOL REV, (2003), vol. 194, pages 77 - 95 | - LIU, M. ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 451, pages 841 - 845 | - LIU; SCHATZ, TRENDS IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 30, pages 173 - 181 | - PEREZ-DURAN ET AL., CARCINOGENESIS, (2007), vol. 28, no. 12, pages 2427 - 33 | - ROBBIANI ET AL., MOL CELL, (2009), vol. 36, no. 4, pages 631 - 41 | - PASQUALUCCI ET AL., NAT. GENET., (2008), vol. 40, pages 108 - 112 | - MUTO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 2752 - 2757 | - OKAZAKI ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2003), vol. 197, pages 1173 - 1181 | - SHEN ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 45, pages 1883 - 1892 | - KOVALCHUK, J. EXP. MCD., (2007), vol. 204, pages 2989 - 3001 | - RAMIRO ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2004), vol. 200, pages 1103 - 1110 | - KUPPERS, ONCOGENE, (2005), vol. 20, pages 5580 - 5594 | - HANCER ET AL., LEUK LYMPHOMA., (201101), vol. 52, no. 1, pages 79 - 84 | - HEINTEL ET AL., LEUKEMIA., (200404), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 756 - 62 | - MAO ET AL., BR J DERMATOL, (2001), vol. 145, pages 117 - 122 | - CHAUDHURI ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 430, pages 992 - 8 | - GREEVE ET AL., BLOOD, (2003), vol. 1010, pages 3574 - 3580 | - FELDHAHN ET AL., J EXP MED, (2007), vol. 204, pages 1157 - 1166 | - KOTANI ET AL., PNAS USA, (2007), vol. 104, pages 1616 - 1620 | - ENGCLS, APPL IMMUNOHISTOCHCM MOL MORPHOL, (2008), vol. 16, pages 521 - 529 | - KLEMM ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2009), vol. 6, pages 232 - 245 | - PALACIOS ET AL., BLOOD, (2010), vol. 115, no. 22, pages 4488 - 4496 | - LEUENBERGER ET AL., MOD PATHOL, (2009), vol. 32, pages 177 - 186 | - GRUBER ET AL., CANCER RES, (2010), vol. 70, pages 7411 - 7420 | - MARUSAWA, INT J BIOCHEM CELL BIOL., (2008), vol. 40, pages 399 - 402 | - HARDIANTI ET AL., LEUKEMIA, (2004), vol. 18, pages 826 - 831 | - SHIKATA ET AL., CANCER SCI., (2012), vol. 103, no. 3, pages 415 - 21 | - QIU ET AL., MOD PATHOL, (2012), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 36 - 45 | - BORCHERT ET AL., BMC CANCER, (2011), vol. 11, page 347 | - MARUSAWA ET AL., ADV IMMUNOL, (2011), vol. 111, pages 109 - 41 | - ZHANG ET AL., HUM PATHOL, (2012), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 423 - 34 | - KOMORI ET AL., HCPATOLOGY, (2008), vol. 47, no. 3, pages 888 - 896 | - HOCKLEY, LEUKEMIA, (2010), vol. 24, no. 5, pages 1084 - 6 | - NAKAMURA ET AL., BR J DERMATOL., (2011), vol. 165, no. 2, pages 437 - 9 | - XU ET AL., SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 296, pages 2033 - 6 | - WHITE ET AL., AUTOIMMUNITY, (2011), vol. 44, no. 8, pages 585 - 98 | - KLEIN, DNA REPAIR, (2008), vol. 7, pages 686 - 93 | - SAN FILIPPO ET AL., ANNUAL REVIEW OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 77, pages 229 - 257 | - LI ET AL., PNAS, (1996), vol. 93, pages 10222 - 7 | - YOKOYAMA ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, no. 4, pages 2767 - 72 | - THACKER, TRENDS GENET., (1999), vol. 15, pages 166 - 168 | - SCHILD D ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 16443 - 16449 | - MODESTI ET AL., MOL CELL, (2007), vol. 28, pages 468 - 481 | - DUNLOP ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2012), vol. 6, no. 287, pages 12343 - 7 | - MAZINA ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (20111206), vol. 287, no. 15, pages 11820 - 32 | - COUSINEAU ET AL., CANCER RES, (2005), vol. 65, pages 11384 - 91 | - YANG ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, pages 31980 - 7 | - BROSH ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2000), vol. 275, pages 23500 - 8 | - ROSSI ET AL., DNA REPAIR, (2010), vol. 9, pages 796 - 804 | - THACKER, BIOCHIMIE, (1999), vol. 81, pages 77 - 85 | - BRAYBROOKE ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2000), vol. 275, pages 29110 - 6 | - DEANS ET AL., EMBO J, (2000), vol. 19, pages 6675 - 6685 | - JOHNSON, NATURE, (1999), vol. 401, pages 397 - 9 | - DOHNER ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 92, pages 4031 - 5 | - SIMMONS ET AL., LEUKEMIA, (2002), vol. 16, pages 2408 - 2416 | - LIU ET AL., J BIOMED BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 2, pages 106 - 113 | - DEANS ET AL., CANCER RES, (2003), vol. 63, pages 8181 - 7 | - CADDLE ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2008), vol. 28, pages 2295 - 2303 | - ORII ET AL., PNAS, (2006), vol. 103, pages 10017 - 10022 | - ADAM ET AL., DNA REPAIR (AMST., (2007), vol. 6, pages 224 - 234 | - HASHAM ET AL., NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 11, no. 9, pages 820 - 826 | - ROBERTI ET AL., J. MED. CHEM, (2003), vol. 46, pages 3546 - 54 | - BADERSCHNEIDER; WINTERHALTER, J OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEM, (2000), vol. 48, pages 2681 - 6 | - HILLIS; ISHIKURA, JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (1968), vol. 32, pages 323 - 336 | - KIM ET AL., J MED CHEM, (2002), vol. 45, pages 160 - 4 | - YOUNG ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (1972), vol. 94, pages 3976 - 81 | - ILIYA ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 62, pages 601 - 6 | - AGUAMAH ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1981), vol. 20, pages 1381 - 3 | - KIM ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, pages 16340 - 4 | - HOUSTON TX, MOL CANCER THER, (2009), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 2894 - 2902 | - ROGAKOU ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, pages 5858 - 5868 | - ROTHKAMM; L6BRICH, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2003), vol. 100, no. 9, pages 5057 - 5062 | - RCDON, AGING, (2011), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 168 - 74 | - RAKIMAN ET AL., ADVANCED BIOTECH, (2008), page 39 | - ORLOW ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2008), vol. 26, pages 3560 - 3566 | - MULLER ET AL., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF RADIATION BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 65, pages 315 - 319 | - FAIRBAIRN ET AL., MUTATION RESEARCH/REVIEWS IN GENETIC TOXICOLOGY, (1995), vol. 339, pages 37 - 59 | - ISHIDA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2009), vol. 37, pages 3367 - 3376 | - KOSHKIN A.A., TETRAHEDRON, (1998), vol. 54, pages 3607 - 3630 | - OBIKA S., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1998), vol. 39, pages 5401 - 5404 | - WENGEL J., ACC. CHEM. RES., (1999), vol. 32, pages 301 - 310 | - BRAASCH D.A.; COREY, D.R., CHEM. BIOL., (2001), vol. 8, pages 1 - 7 | - CRINELLI R., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2002), vol. 30, pages 2435 - 2443 | - ISHIDA, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2009), vol. 37, pages 3367 - 3376 | - BEVAN ET AL., TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 13, pages 115 - 122 | - ECKER; CROOKE, BIOTECHNOLOGY (NY, (1995), vol. 13, pages 351 - 360 | - HODGSON, BIOTECHNOLOGY (NY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 973 - 980 | - METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (19950927), vol. 49, pages 229 - 238 | - CHIRGWIN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 18, pages 5294 - 5299 | - DULAC, C., CURR. TOP. DEV. BIOL., (1998), vol. 36, page 245 | - JENA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1996), vol. 190, page 199 | - DING ET AL., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, pages 1594 - 1596 | - LYNN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2001), vol. 123, pages 8155 - 8156 | - SCHIFFELERS; STORM, EXPERT OPIN DRUG DELIV., (200605), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 445 - 54 | - HUGHES ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL., (2010), vol. 605, pages 445 - 59 | - SARVER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1222 - 1225 | - HASELOFF; GERLACH, NATURE, (1988), vol. 334, pages 585 - 591 | - ZAUG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 224, pages 574 - 578 | - ZAUG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 231, pages 470 - 475 | - ZAUG ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 324, pages 429 - 433 | - BEEN ET AL., CELL, (1986), vol. 47, pages 207 - 216 | - LIM, GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (2003), vol. 17, pages 991 - 1008 | - LIM ET AL., SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 299, page 1540 | - LEE; AMBROS, SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 294, page 862 | - LAU ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 294, pages 858 - 861 | - LAGOS-QUINTANA ET AL., CURRENT BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 12, pages 735 - 739 | - LAGOS QUINTANA ET AL., SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 294, pages 853 - 857 | - LAGOS-QUINTANA ET AL., RNA, (2003), vol. 9, pages 175 - 179 | - BARTEL ET AL., CELL, (2004), vol. 116, pages 281 - 297 | - HUNKAPILLCR; HOOD, NATURE, (1986), vol. 323, pages 15 - 16 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, EUR, J. IMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 6, pages 511 - 519 | - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281 | - VAN HOLDE, K. E., Physical Bio-chemistry, PRENTICE-HALL, (1971), pages 221 - 239 | - SIMON ET AL., TRENDS IN GENETICS, (1998), vol. 14, page 272 | - EMMERT-BUCK ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 998 - 1001 | - GIBSON ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 6, pages 995 - 1001 | - HEID ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 6, pages 986 - 994 | - GIBSON ET AL., GENOME RES., (1996), vol. 10, pages 995 - 1001 | - HEID ET AL., GENOME RES., (1996), vol. 10, pages 986 - 994 | - R. L. MARSHALL ET AL., PCR METHODS AND APPLICATIONS, (1994), vol. 4, pages 80 - 84 | - WU; WALLACE, GENOMICS, (1989), vol. 4, page 560 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, page 1077 | - GUATELLI ET AL., PNAS USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 1874 | - KWOH ET AL., PNAS USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 1173 | - G. T. WALKER ET AL., CLIN. CHEM., (1996), vol. 42, pages 9 - 13 | - CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 52, pages 1855 - 1863 | - PNAS USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 1874 - 1878 | - NATURE, (1991), vol. 350, no. 6313, pages 91 - 92 | - MOLLASALEHI ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (2012), vol. 425, pages 91 - 95 | - RYAN ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (2008), vol. 45, no. 1, pages 81 - 94 | - WANG Z ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS GENETICS, (2009), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 57 - 63 | - MAHER CA ET AL., NATURE, (2009), vol. 458, no. 7234, pages 97 - 101 | - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 1874 | - KWOH, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 1173 | - SCHENA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 20, pages 467 - 470 | - GERHOLD ET AL., TRENDS IN BIOCHEM. SCI., (1999), vol. 24, pages 168 - 173 | - LENNON ET AL., DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (2000), vol. 5, pages 59 - 65 | - OELLERICH, M., J. CLIN. CHEM. CLIN. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 22, pages 895 - 904 | - STEMMANN O.; ZOU H.; GERBER S. A.; GYGI S. P.; KIRSCHNER M. W., "Dual inhibition of sister chromatid separation at metaphase", CELL, (20011214), vol. 107, pages 715 - 726 | - KESHISHIAN ET AL., MOLECULAR & CELLULAR PROTEOMICS, (2007), vol. 6.12, pages 2212 - 2229 | - TOWBIN ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI., (1979), vol. 76, page 4350 | - LI ET AL., TIBTECH, (2000), vol. 18, pages 151 - 160 | - ROWLEY ET AL., METHODS, (2000), vol. 20, pages 383 - 397 | - KUSTER; MANN, CURR. OPIN. STRUCTURAL BIOL., (1998), vol. 8, pages 393 - 400 | - CHAIT ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 262, pages 89 - 92 | - KCOUGH, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1999), vol. 96, pages 7131 - 6 | - BERGMAN, EXS, (2000), vol. 88, pages 133 - 44 | - Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, 4.sup.th ed., JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1995), vol. 15, pages 1071 - 1094 | - VOLPI; BRIDGER, BIOTECHNIQUES, (200810), vol. 45, no. 4, pages 385 - 409 | - SCHULTZ ET AL., JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 151, pages 1381 - 1390 | - HOCHEGGER; TAKEDA, SUBCELL BIOCHEM., (2006), vol. 40, pages 313 - 325 | - HAYAT, M.A., Methods of Cancer Diagnosis, Therapy and Prognosis, SPRINGER, (2009), vol. 3 | - COLLINS-BUROW ET AL., "Rituximab and its Role as Maintenance Therapy in non-Hodgkin Lymphoma", EXPERT REV ANTICANCER THER, (2007), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 257 - 73 | - MARCUS ET AL., "The Therapeutic Use of Rituximab in non-Hodgkin's Lymphoma", EUR J HAEMOTAL, (2007), vol. 67, pages 5 - 14 | - RIVERA ET AL., NAT. MED., (1996), vol. 2, pages 1028 - 32 | - NO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 3346 - 51 | - GOSSEN; BUJARD, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 5547 - 51 | - POLLOCK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 13221 - 26 | - RIVERA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 8657 - 62 | - PENG ET AL., "Viral Vector Targeting", CURR. OPIN BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 10, pages 454 - 457 | - GUNZBURG ET AL., "Retroviral Vector Targeting for Gene Therapy", CYTOKINES MOL. THER., (1996), vol. 2, pages 177 - 184 | - WICKHAM, "Targeting Adenovirus", GENE THER., (2000), vol. 7, pages 110 - 114 | - DACHS ET AL., "Targeting Gene Therapy to Cancer: A Review", ONCOL. RES., (1997), vol. 9, pages 313 - 325 | - CURIEL, "Strategies to Adapt Adenoviral Vectors for Targeted Delivery", ANN NY ACAD. SCI., (1999), vol. 886, page 158171 | - FINDEIS ET AL., "Targeted Delivery of DNA for Gene Therapy via Receptors", TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 1, page 202205 | - CRISTIANO ET AL., "Strategies to Accomplish Gene Delivery Via the Receptor-Mediated Endocytosis Pathway", CANCER GENE THER., vol. 3, no. 1, pages 49 - 57 | - S. C. PHILIPS, "Receptor-Mediated DNA Deliver Approaches to Human Gene Therapy", BIOLOGICALS, (199503), vol. 23, no. 1, pages 13 - 6 | - MICHAEL ET AL., "Strategies to Achieve Targeted Gene Delivery Via the Receptor-Mediated Endocytosis Pathway", GENE THER., (199407), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 223 - 32 | - LIN ET AL., "Antiangiogenic Gene Therapy Targeting The Endothelium-Specific Receptor Tyrosine Kinase Tie2", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 8829 - 8834 | - SUDIMACK ET AL., "Targeted Drug Delivery Via the Folate Receptor", ADV. DRUG DELIV., (200003), pages 147 - 62 | - FAN, "Therapeutic Application of Anti-Growth Factor Receptor Antibodies", CURR. OPIN. ONCOL., (199801), vol. 10, no. 1, pages 67 - 73 | - WADHWA ET AL., "Receptor Mediated Glycotargeting", J. DRUG TARGET, (1995), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 111 - 27 | - PERALES ET AL., "An Evaluation of Receptor-Mediated Gene Transfer Using Synthetic DNA-Ligand Complexes", EUR. J. BIOCHEM, (199412), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 226,255 - 66 | - SMITH ET AL., "Hepatocyte Directed Gene Delivery by Receptor-Mediated Endocytosis", SEMIN LIVER DIS., (1999), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 83 - 92 | - KUROKI ET AL., "Specific Targeting Strategies of Cancer Gene Therapy Using a Single-Chain Variable Fragment (scFv) with a High Affinity for CEA", ANTICANCER RES., (2000), pages 4067 - 71 | - JIANG ET AL., "In Vivo Cell Type-Specific Gene Deiivery With Retroviral Vectors That Display Single Chain Antibodies", GENE THER., (1999), vol. 6, pages 1982 - 7 | - ENGELSTADTER ET AL., "Targeting Human T Cells By Retroviral Vectors Displaying Antibody Domains Selected From A Phage Display Library", HUM. GENE THER., (2000), vol. 11, pages 293 - 303 | - JIANG, "Cell-Type-Specific Gene Transfer Into Human Cells With. Retroviral Vectors That Display Single-Chain Antibodies", J. VIROL., (1998), vol. 72, pages 10148 - 56 | - CHU ET AL., "Toward Highly Efficient Cell-Type-Specific Gene Transfer With Retroviral Vectors Displaying Single-Chain Antibodies", J. VIROL, (1997), vol. 71, pages 720 - 5 | - CHU ET AL., "Retroviral Vector Particles Displaying The Antigen-Binding Site Of An Antibody Enable Cell-Type-Specific Gene Transfer", J. VIROL, (1995), vol. 69, pages 2659 - 63 | - CHU ET AL., "Cell Targeting With Retroviral Vector Particles Containing Antibody-Envelope Fusion Proteins", GENE THER., (1994), vol. 1, pages 292 - 9 | - LOPEZ-GUILLERMO, A. ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL, (1994), vol. 12, pages 1343 - 1348 | - SOLAL-CELIGNY ET AL., BLOOD, (2004), vol. 104, pages 1258 - 1265 | - RUCZINSKI, 1., J. OF COMPUTATIONAL AND GRAPHICAL STATISTICS, (2003), vol. 12, pages 475 - 511 | - FRIEDMAN, J. H., "Regularized Discriminant Analysis", JASA, (1989), vol. 84, pages 165 - 175 | - BREIMAN, L., RANDOM FORESTS, MACHINE LEARNING, (2001), vol. 45, pages 5 - 32 | - PEPE, M. S., THE STATISTICAL EVALUATION OF MEDICAL TESTS FOR CLASSIFICATION AND PREDICTION, (2003), vol. 28 | - ZWEIG, M. H.; CAMPBELL, G., CLIN. CHEM., (1993), vol. 39, pages 561 - 577 | - URQUHART ET AL., ANN. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL., (1984), vol. 24, pages 199 - 236 | - WANG ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1987), vol. 147, pages 980 - 985 | - ZHOU, JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1992), vol. 19, pages 269 - 274 | - HU, S.T.P.PHARMA. SCI., (1994), vol. 4, no. 6, page 466 | - ALLEN ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1987), vol. 223, page 42 | - WU ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, page 3765 | - PAPAHADJOPOULOS ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 507, page 64 | - GABIZON ET AL., PNAS, (1988), vol. 85, page 6949 | - KLIBANOV ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1990), vol. 268, page 235 | - SUNAMOTO ET AL., BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1980), vol. 53, page 2778 | - ILIUM ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1984), vol. 167, page 79 | - BLUME ET AL., BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1990), vol. 1029, page 91 | - IDSON, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 199 | - ROSOFF, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 1, page 245 | - LIEBERMAN, RIEGER AND BANKER, Block in Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1988), vol. 2, page 199,245, | - HIGUCHI ET AL., Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1985), page 301 | - LEUNG; SHAH, Controlled Release of Drugs: Polymers and Aggregate Systems, VCH PUBLISHERS, (1989), pages 185 - 215 | - SCHOTT, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1985), page 271 | - CONSTANTINIDES ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 11, pages 1385 - 1390 | - RITSCHEL, METH. FIND. EXP. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (1993), vol. 13, page 205 | - HO ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1996), vol. 85, pages 138 - 143 | - LEE ET AL., CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1991), page 92 | - TAKAHASHI ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1988), vol. 40, page 252 | - MURANISHI, CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1990), vol. 7, pages 1 - 33 | - EL HARIRI ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1992), vol. 44, pages 651 - 654 | - BRUNTON ET AL., The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, 9th Ed.,, MCGRAW-HILL, (1996), pages 934 - 935 | - SWINYARD, Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO., (1990), pages 782 - 783 | - YAMAMOTO ET AL., J. PHARM. EXP. THER., (1992), vol. 263, page 25 | - YAMASHITA ET AL., J. PHARM. SCI., (1990), vol. 79, pages 579 - 583 | - JARRETT, J., CHROMATOGR., (1993), vol. 618, pages 315 - 339 | - BUUR ET AL., J. CONTROL PEL., (1990), vol. 14, pages 43 - 51 | - HASHAM; TSYGANKOV, VIROLOGY, (2004), vol. 320, pages 313 - 329 | - MURAMATSU ET AL., CELL, (2000), vol. 102, pages 553 - 63 | - NAKAMURA, M. ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 8, pages 193 - 201 | - OKAZAKI ET AL., J EXP MED., (2003), vol. 197, no. 9, pages 1173 - 81 | - IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 174, no. 10, pages 6477 - 89 | - LEUKEMIA, NN, vol. 24, no. 11, pages 1859 - 66 | - ANN NY ACAD SCI, (2007), vol. 1103, pages 90 - 3 | - WOO ET AL., ONCOGENE, (2007), vol. 26, no. 41, pages 6010 - 20 | - BIOINFORMATICS, (2009), vol. 25, no. 14, pages 1754 - 60 | - DCANS ET AL., EMBO J, (2000), vol. 19, pages 6675 - 6685 | - ANDREWS ET AL., J EXP MED, (1978), vol. 148, pages 1198 - 215 | - DIXON ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (1978), vol. 21, pages 64 - 7 | - IZUI ET AL., INT REV IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 19, pages 447 - 72 | - MCPHEE ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2011), vol. 187, pages 4695 - 4704 |